EP2400400 - Semantic search engine using lexical functions and meaning-text criteria [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inbenta Professional Services, S.L. Angel Guimera 22 08017 Barcelona / ES | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Torras Mañá, Jordi Angel Guimera 22 08017 Barcelona / ES | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Isern-Jara, Jaime P&T Intellectual Property S.L. Sant Elies 21, 3-1 08006 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Isern-Jara, Jaime P & T Intellectual Property, S.L. C/Muntaner 335 entresuelo 1 08021 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 10006460.9 | 22.06.2010 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2400400 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27, G06F17/30 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
G06F16/3334 (EP);
G06F16/3344 (EP);
G06F40/284 (EP);
G06F40/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Semantische Suchmaschine, die lexikalische Funktionen und Meaning-Text-Kriterien anwendet | [2011/52] | English: | Semantic search engine using lexical functions and meaning-text criteria | [2011/52] | French: | Moteur de recherche sémantique utilisant des fonctions léxicales et des critères sense-texte | [2011/52] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 01.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/34] | 18.07.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.11.2016 | 24.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009100053 (BOSCHEE ELIZABETH MEGAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [I] 5-12; | [I]EP1400901 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [I] 1,3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0752676 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,6,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5826260 (BYRD JR ROY JEFFERSON [US], et al) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [A] - J. APRESJAN ET AL., "Semantic paraphrasing for information retrieval and extraction", FQAS 2009, LNAI 5822 (EDS. T. ANDERSON ET AL), Springer Heidelberg Berlin, (2009), pages 512 - 523, XP002613129 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |