EP2228039 - Injector for intraocular lens system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visiogen, Inc. 4 Jenner Street, Suite 180 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsai, George 27481 Almendra Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB | ||
Former [2010/37] | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Midsummer House 413 Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 10006514.3 | 01.02.2005 | [2010/37] | Priority number, date | US20040541429P | 02.02.2004 Original published format: US 541429 P | US20050046154 | 28.01.2005 Original published format: US 46154 | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2228039 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2228039 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
A61F2/1678 (EP,US);
A61F2/1648 (EP,US);
A61F2/1662 (US);
A61F2/167 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Injektor für Intraokularlinsensystem | [2010/37] | English: | Injector for intraocular lens system | [2010/37] | French: | Injecteur pour système de lentille intraoculaire | [2010/37] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 23.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05722620.1 / EP1711129 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050722620) is 25.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2005 | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | ES | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | IT | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | PL | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 01.02.2005 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 01.02.2005 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.02.2005 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
GR | 01.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9513022 (IOVISION INC [US]) [A] 1,2,7,10,12,13 * page 14, line 24 - page 15, line 2 * * page 16, line 31 - page 17, line 17; figure 13 *; | [A]US5507806 (BLAKE LARRY W [US]) [A] 1-4,7-14 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 65; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2001020171 (HEYMAN THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1,7-10,12,13 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039]; figures 1,12,16; claim 1 *; | [A]US2003158560 (PORTNEY VALDEMAR [US]) [A] 5,6* claim 1 *; | [ADP]WO2004073560 (VISIOGEN INC [US], et al) [ADP] 1-14 * paragraphs [0067] , [0071]; figures 15,16,21; claims 3-5,8-13 * | by applicant | US2003078656 | US20030637376 | US20040958871 |