EP2272786 - Crane control for controlling a crane's hoisting gear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Werk Nenzing GmbH Dr.-Hans-Liebherr-Strasse 1 6710 Nenzing / AT | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Klaus, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Unteres Moos 8 88145 Hergatz / DE | 02 /
Sawodny, Oliver, Professor Dr.-Ing. Stälinweg 40 70186 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Küchler, Sebastian Culmbacher Strasse 46 71034 Böblingen / DE | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10006767.7 | 30.06.2010 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | DE20091032269 | 08.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009032269 | [2011/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2272786 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2272786 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B66C13/06 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
B66C13/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/02] | Title | German: | Kransteuerung zur Ansteuerung eines Hubwerkes eines Kranes | [2011/02] | English: | Crane control for controlling a crane's hoisting gear | [2011/02] | French: | Commande de grue pour la commande d'un dispositif de levage de grue | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 21.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2010 | AL | 17.10.2012 | CY | 17.10.2012 | CZ | 17.10.2012 | DK | 17.10.2012 | EE | 17.10.2012 | FI | 17.10.2012 | HR | 17.10.2012 | LT | 17.10.2012 | LV | 17.10.2012 | MC | 17.10.2012 | MK | 17.10.2012 | MT | 17.10.2012 | PL | 17.10.2012 | RO | 17.10.2012 | SE | 17.10.2012 | SI | 17.10.2012 | SK | 17.10.2012 | SM | 17.10.2012 | TR | 17.10.2012 | BG | 17.01.2013 | GR | 18.01.2013 | IS | 17.02.2013 | PT | 18.02.2013 | IE | 30.06.2013 | LU | 30.06.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 30.06.2010 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
MK | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
SM | 17.10.2012 | ||
TR | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 30.06.2013 | ||
LU | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
MK | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
SM | 17.10.2012 | ||
TR | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
SM | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
IE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 17.10.2012 | |
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 17.10.2012 | |
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 17.10.2012 | |
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 17.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005320146 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]DE102007039408 (LIEBHERR WERK NENZING [AT]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP1652810 (SINTOKOGIO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP1880971 (LIEBHERR WERK NENZING [AT]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |