EP2272646 - Assembly and method for continuous production of ready mix concrete [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bezzi, Francesco Via S. Antonio, 4 38026 Ossana/Cusiano / IT | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Oberosler, Ludwig Oberosler SAS 20/a Via Dante-CP 307 39100 Bolzano / IT | [2011/02] | Application number, filing date | 10006841.0 | 02.07.2010 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | IT2009BZ00029 | 07.07.2009 Original published format: IT BZ20090029 | [2011/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2272646 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B28C9/00, B01F13/10, B01F15/04, B28C7/04, G01G19/22 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
B28C9/002 (EP);
B01F33/84 (EP);
B01F35/881 (EP);
B28C7/0422 (EP);
B28C7/0454 (EP);
B28C7/0481 (EP);
G01G19/22 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anlage und Verfahren zur durchgehenden Herstellung vorgefertigter Betonmischungen | [2011/02] | English: | Assembly and method for continuous production of ready mix concrete | [2011/02] | French: | Installation et procédé de fabrication continue de mélanges de béton prêt à l'emploi | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 19.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008025049 (HUHHOT CHI CHE EURO TECHNIC GM [AT], et al) [X] 1-6 * pages 3-7; figure - *; | [AD]US2007289737 (PESSIN JEAN-LOUIS [US], et al) [AD] 1-6 * paragraphs [0017] - [0050]; figure - *; | [AD]EP0344521 (AZO GMBH & CO [DE]) [AD] 1,5 * columns 4-5 * * column 2; figure *; | [A]DE972193 (NAUTA JOHANNES EWARDUS [NL]) [A] 1,5 * column 2, lines 4-44 * | by applicant | WO2007144844 | DE3113129 | EP0034452 |