EP2272774 - Container with a membrane which confines a compartment within the container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huhtamäki Oyj Revontulenkuja 1 FI-02100 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Huhtamäki Oyj Keilaranta 10 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marshall, Neil 26 Vicarage Lane Fareham Hants PO14 2LA / GB | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger & Wolff Anwaltssozietät Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10006946.7 | 06.07.2010 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | DE20091026108 | 06.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009026108 | DE20091044772 | 04.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009044772 | DE20101016390 | 09.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010016390 | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2272774 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2272774 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/816 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
B65D85/816 (EP,US);
B31F1/0038 (EP);
B65D1/265 (EP);
B65D81/3876 (EP);
B31B2105/00 (EP);
B31B2105/001 (EP,US);
B31B2105/0022 (EP);
B31B2110/10 (EP);
B31B2110/20 (EP);
B31B2120/002 (EP);
B31B2120/50 (EP,US);
B31B2120/70 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Behälter mit einer Membran, die ein Fach innerhalb des Behälters eingrenzt | [2011/02] | English: | Container with a membrane which confines a compartment within the container | [2011/02] | French: | Conteneur doté d'une membrane comprenant fermant le compartiment intérieur du conteneur | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 30.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2152469 (DRG UK LTD) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 85 - page 2, line 4 * * page 2, lines 67-123; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0254446 (GEN FOODS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-2 *; | [A]FR2844777 (ROUVIERE JEAN YVES NICOLAS [FR]) [A] 1* page 4, lines 16-31; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2009092711 (NINH ANDY [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-6 * |