EP2355065 - Bidirectional communication between a sensor unit and a monitor unit in patient monitoring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CardioNet, Inc. 1000 Cedar Hollow Road, Suite 102 Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2015/46] |
Former [2015/41] | For all designated states CardioNet, Inc. 1000 Cedar Hollow Road, Suite 102 Malvem, PA 19355 / US | ||
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states CardioNet, Inc. 227 Washington Street no.300 Conshohocken, PA 19428 / US | ||
Former [2012/29] | For all designated states CardioNet, Inc. 750 B Street Suite 1400 San Diego, CA 92101 / US | ||
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Cardionet, Inc. 227 Washington Street, Suite 300 Conshohocken PA 19428 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eggers, Phillip N. 7704 Timberline Dr. Salt Lake City, UT 84121 / US | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Pisani, Diana Jean, et al Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Pisani, Diana Jean, et al Ropes & Gray International LLP 60 Ludgate Hill London EC4M 7AW / GB | ||
Former [2013/15] | Curran, Clair, et al Ropes & Gray International LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3BF / GB | ||
Former [2012/08] | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/32] | Bradford, Victoria Sophie Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10006965.7 | 22.04.2002 | [2011/32] | Priority number, date | US20010841134 | 23.04.2001 Original published format: US 841134 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2355065 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2355065 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/00, G08B25/10 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
G08B25/009 (EP,US);
G08B29/02 (KR);
G08B25/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/32] | G08B25/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2016/42] |
Former [2011/32] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Bidirektionelle Verbindung zwischen einer Sensoreinheit und einer Überwachungseinheit in einem Patientenüberwachungssystem | [2011/32] | English: | Bidirectional communication between a sensor unit and a monitor unit in patient monitoring | [2011/32] | French: | Communication bidirectionnelle entre une unité de capteur et une unité de surveillance pour la surveillance de patient | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 19.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02746316.5 / EP1415289 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020746316) is 11.05.2006 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 19.10.2016 | [2017/38] | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]EP0811959 (GRUNDIG AG [DE]) [ID] 1-21 * abstract * * column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 4 * * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 42; figures 1-4 *; | [ID]US5461365 (SCHLAGER DAN [US], et al) [ID] 1-21 * page 4, line 52 - page 7, line 14 * * page 9, line 27 - page 10, line 39 *; | [ID]EP0484880 (SCHAAF NORBERT [DE]) [ID] 1-21 * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 11 * * column 9, line 39 - column 11, line 22 *; | [AD]US5959529 (KAIL IV KARL A [US]) [AD] 1-21 * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 21 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 57 *; | [AD]FR2787905 (CEDI SECURITE [FR]) [AD] 1-21 * page 8, line 30 - page 11, line 38 *; | [AD]US5950110 (HENDRICKSON ROBERT C [US]) [AD] 1-21 * abstract * | by applicant | US5959529 | US5461365 | EP0811959 | FR2787905 | EP0834846 |