EP2230042 - Laser processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/38] | Laser processing method and semiconductor device | ||
[2017/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2017/43] |
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho, Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuno, Koji c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Tatsuya c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
Sakamoto, Takeshi c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2017/43] |
Former [2010/38] | 01 /
Kuno, Koji c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | ||
02 /
Suzuki, Tatsuya c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | |||
03 /
Sakamoto, Takeshi c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/43] |
Former [2010/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10006971.5 | 27.07.2005 | [2010/38] | Priority number, date | JP20040231555 | 06.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004231555 | [2010/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2230042 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2230042 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2230042 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/40, B28D5/00, // B23K101/40 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
B28D1/221 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/53 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/562 (KR,US);
B23K26/0622 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/40 (EP,KR,US);
B28D5/0011 (EP,KR,US);
C03B33/0222 (EP,KR,US);
B23K2101/40 (EP,KR,US);
B23K2103/172 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2017/43] |
Former [2010/38] | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Laserbearbeitungsverfahren | [2017/23] | English: | Laser processing method | [2017/20] | French: | Procédé de traitement laser | [2017/20] |
Former [2010/38] | Laserbearbeitungsverfahren und halbleiterbauelement | ||
Former [2010/38] | Laser processing method and semiconductor device | ||
Former [2010/38] | Procédé de traitement laser et dispositif semi-conducteur | Examination procedure | 06.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 10.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05767042.4 / EP1775059 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050767042) is 23.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 25.10.2017 | [2018/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH0737559 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 4 * the whole document *[A] 1; | [XAY]EP1338371 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [X] 4 * the whole document * [A] 3 [Y] 2; | [XY]JP2003334675 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [X]JP2003338636 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [XA]JP2004001076 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [X] 4 * the whole document * [A] 1 | by applicant | JPS59212185 | - "Internal Marking of Glass Substrate with Solid-state Laser", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 45TH LASER MATERIALS PROCESSING CONFERENCE, (199812), pages 23 - 28 | - "Silicon Processing Characteristic Evaluation by Picosecond Pulse Laser", PREPRINTS OF THE NATIONAL MEETINGS OF JAPAN WELDING SOCIETY, (200004), vol. 66, pages 72 - 73 | - "Forming of Photoinduced Structure within Glass by Femtosecond Laser Irradiation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 42ND LASER MATERIALS PROCESSING CONFERENCE, (199711), pages 105 - 111 |