EP2241197 - Agent and edible material for inhibiting body fat accumulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Sugar Co., Ltd. 8-2, Nihonbashi Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kashimura, Jun c/o Mitsui Sugar Co., Ltd. 1-2-14 Honson Chigasaki-shi Kangawa 253-0042 / JP | 02 /
Nagai, Yukie c/o Mitsui Sugar Co., Ltd. 1-2-14 Honson Chigasaki-shi Kangawa 253-0042 / JP | 03 /
Ebashi, Tadashi c/o Mitsui Sugar Co., Ltd. 1-2-14 Honson Chigasaki-shi Kangawa 253-0042 / JP | [2012/34] |
Former [2010/42] | 01 /
Kashimura, Jun c/o Mitsui Sugar Co., Ltd. 1-2-14 Honson Chigasaki-shi Kangawa 253-0042 / JP | ||
02 /
Nagai, Yukie c/o Mitsui Sugar Co., Ltd. 1-2-14 Honson Chigasaki-shi Kangawa 253-0042 / JP | |||
03 /
Ebashi, Tadashi c/o Mitsui Sugar Co., Ltd. 1-2-14 Honson Chigasaki-shi Kangawa 253-0042 / JP | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/42] | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10007324.6 | 18.11.2003 | [2010/42] | Priority number, date | JP20020334032 | 18.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002334032 | JP20030096395 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003096395 | JP20030386594 | 17.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003386594 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2241197 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2241197 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A61K31/70, A23L1/236, A61P3/04 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
A23L27/33 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,KR,US);
A21D2/181 (EP,US);
A23L2/60 (EP,US);
A23L33/20 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/62, A23V2250/606 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/62, A23V2250/628 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2010/42] | Title | German: | Zusatzstoff und Lebensmittel für die Verminderung der Adiposität | [2010/42] | English: | Agent and edible material for inhibiting body fat accumulation | [2010/42] | French: | Additif et produit alimentaire pour prévenir l'accumulation de graisse corporelle | [2010/42] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 09.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03772878.9 / EP1568285 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030772878) is 25.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.05.2013
31.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2018/17] |
Former [2013/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.05.2013
N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative van Duijvenbode, René Cornelis, et al, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | 01.07.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.01.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.01.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/09] | Appeal following opposition | 01.04.2015 | Appeal received No. T0676/15 | 29.05.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.01.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1424074 (MEIJI DAIRIES CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,6,8 * paragraphs [0005] , [0009] - [0011] - [0039] * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1,3,4,25,27,32 * * table 1 *; | [A] - KAWAI K ET AL, "CHANGES IN BLOOD GLUCOSE AND INSULIN AFTER AN ORAL PALATINOSE ADMINISTRATION IN NORMAL SUBJECTS", BIOSIS, (1986), XP002263919 [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - LUDWIG D S ET AL, "High glycemic index foods, overeating, and obesity", PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, EVANSTON, IL, US LNKD- DOI:10.1542/PEDS.103.3.E26, (19990301), vol. 103, no. 3, ISSN 0031-4005, page E26, XP002205465 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1542/peds.103.3.e26 | by applicant | JPS6485058 | JPH0279955 | JPH05252897 | JPH06100453 | JPH06128161 | JPH06245735 | JPH08133970 | JPH08283169 | JPH08289783 | - KENKO/EIYOSYOKUHIN KENKYU, (1999), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 52 - 56 | - KENKO/EIYOSYOKUHIN KENKYU, (2000), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 47 - 58 | - NIHON EIYO/SYOKURYO GAKKAI SHI, (1997), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 133 - 137 | - NIPPON NOGEIKAGAKU KAISHI, (1998), vol. 72, no. 8, pages 923 - 931 | - HORMONE AND METABOLIC RESEARCH, (1989), vol. 21, pages 338 - 340 | - THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, (198601), vol. 43, pages 167 - 172 | - NIHON EIYO/SYOKURYO GAKKAI SHI, (1983), vol. 36, no. 3, pages 169 - 173 | - ILSI EUROPE CONCISE MONOGRAPH SERIES, (1998), pages 8 - 12 | - KAGAKU TO KOGYO, (1987), vol. 61, no. 1, pages 17 - 24 | - NEW FOOD INDUSTRY, (1989), vol. 31, no. 10, pages 9 - 15 |