EP2277745 - Occupant protection control device, occupant protection system, and occupant protection control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keihin Corporation 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oosaki, Tatsuji c/o KEIHIN CORPORATION Tochigi Research & Development Center, 2021-8 Aza Saginoyahigashi, Hoshakuji Takanezawa-machi Shioya-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | [2014/04] |
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
Oosaki, Tatsuji c/o Keihin Corporation 2021-8, Aza Saginoyahigashi Hoshakuji, Takanezawa-machi Shioya-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2014/22] |
Former [2011/04] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10007465.7 | 19.07.2010 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | JP20090171343 | 22.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009171343 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2277745 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2277745 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2277745 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/0136 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
B60R21/0136 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | Insassenschutzsteuervorrichtung, Insassenschutzsystem und Insassenschutzsteuerverfahren | [2011/04] | English: | Occupant protection control device, occupant protection system, and occupant protection control method | [2011/04] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de protection d'occupant, système de protection d'occupant et procédé de contrôle de protection d'occupant | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 03.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2010 | AL | 28.05.2014 | AT | 28.05.2014 | BE | 28.05.2014 | BG | 28.05.2014 | CY | 28.05.2014 | CZ | 28.05.2014 | DK | 28.05.2014 | EE | 28.05.2014 | ES | 28.05.2014 | FI | 28.05.2014 | HR | 28.05.2014 | IS | 28.05.2014 | IT | 28.05.2014 | LT | 28.05.2014 | LV | 28.05.2014 | MC | 28.05.2014 | MK | 28.05.2014 | MT | 28.05.2014 | NL | 28.05.2014 | PL | 28.05.2014 | RO | 28.05.2014 | SE | 28.05.2014 | SI | 28.05.2014 | SK | 28.05.2014 | SM | 28.05.2014 | TR | 28.05.2014 | IE | 19.07.2014 | LU | 19.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | FR | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | GB | 28.08.2014 | NO | 28.08.2014 | GR | 29.08.2014 | PT | 29.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
AT | 28.05.2014 | ||
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
BG | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 28.05.2014 | ||
IT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
MK | 28.05.2014 | ||
MT | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
SM | 28.05.2014 | ||
TR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
AT | 28.05.2014 | ||
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
BG | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 28.05.2014 | ||
IT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
MT | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
SM | 28.05.2014 | ||
TR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
AT | 28.05.2014 | ||
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
BG | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 28.05.2014 | ||
IT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
MT | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
SM | 28.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
BG | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 28.05.2014 | ||
IT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
MT | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
SM | 28.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
BG | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
MT | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
SM | 28.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
SM | 28.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.07.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.07.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
ES | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
NO | 28.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 28.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4222595 (TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]DE10130962 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]EP1262375 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US2004129479 (OZAKI TATSUYA [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [X]JP2007153118 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0004] , [0014] , [0015] , [0028] - [0032] - [0037] , [0050] - [0051]; figures 1-12 * * abstract * | by applicant | JP2007160986 |