EP2239352 - Delivering particulate material to a vaporization zone. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/41] | Delivering particulate material to a vaporization zone | ||
[2013/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global OLED Technology LLC 13873 Park Center Road, Suite 330 Herndon, VA 20171 / US | [2011/40] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Global OLED Technology LLC 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Long, Michael 10 Black Tern Terrance Hilton, New York 14468 / US | 02 /
Grace, Jeremy, Matthew 132 Hollybrook Drive Penfield, New York 14526 / US | 03 /
Koppe, Bruce, Edward 702 Cooney Road Calendonia New York 14423 / US | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/41] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10007516.7 | 16.09.2005 | [2010/41] | Priority number, date | US20040945940 | 21.09.2004 Original published format: US 945940 | US20050134654 | 20.05.2005 Original published format: US 134654 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2239352 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2239352 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2239352 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/24, B65G33/00, C23C14/12 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
C23C14/246 (EP,US);
H05B33/10 (KR);
C23C14/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2010/41] | Title | German: | Zufuhr von teilchenförmigem Material zu einer Verdampfungszone. | [2013/02] | English: | Delivering particulate material to a vaporization zone. | [2013/02] | French: | Apport de matière particulaire à une zone de vaporisation. | [2013/02] |
Former [2010/41] | Abgabe von teilchenförmigem Material an eine Verdampfungszone | ||
Former [2010/41] | Delivering particulate material to a vaporization zone | ||
Former [2010/41] | Fourniture d'un matériau à particules dans une zone de vaporisation | Examination procedure | 20.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 01.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05812480.1 / EP1794345 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050812480) is 06.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5651570 ; | [Y]EP0337369 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 4-8 * column 15, line 1 - line 38; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0585848 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 12 * column 4, line 6 - line 43; claim 1 *; | [XY]JPH0995775 (CHUGAI RO KOGYO KAISHA LTD) [X] 1-3,9,11,13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 4-8,10,12,15; | [Y] - SHEPHERD J A ET AL, "DESIGN AND PERFORMANCE OF A NOVEL POWDER FLASH EVAPORATOR", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A, AVS /AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19930701), vol. 11, no. 4, PART 1, ISSN 0734-2101, pages 1451 - 1453, XP000403747 [Y] 10 * paragraph [00II]; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.578682 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810723), vol. 005, no. 114, Database accession no. (C - 64), & JP56051570 A 19810509 (CLARION CO LTD) [Y] 15 * abstract * | Examination | JP2003293121 | by applicant | US2447789 | US3180730 | US3567450 | US3658520 | US4356429 | US4539507 | US4720432 | US4769292 | US4768292 | US4885211 | US4885221 | US5059861 | US5059862 | US5061569 | US5141671 | US5150006 | US5151629 | US5276380 | US5294870 | US5405709 | US5484922 | EP0732868 | US5593788 | US5645948 | US5677572 | US5683823 | US5755999 | US5776623 | WO9855561 | EP0891121 | US5928802 | US5935721 | US5935720 | US6020078 | EP0982411 | WO0018851 | EP1009041 | EP1029909 | WO0057676 | US6140763 | WO0070655 | US6194119 | US6208075 | US20040784585 |