EP2282273 - Generation of enquiries made to data sources in communication networks through a mobile wireless network and transmission of answers from data sources in communication networks to those enquiries made through a mobile wireless network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Holding GmbH Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seifert, Ulrich Cloppenburger Weg 36 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Pölk, Reinhard Niederkasseler Kirchweg 58 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
Hauf, Inna Belsenstrasse, 29 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
Grandt, Olaf Hallstattpfad, 9 44805 Bochum / DE | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | Weisbrodt, Bernd, et al Ring & Weisbrodt Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Hohe Straße 33 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/06] | Ring & Weisbrodt Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Hohe Strasse 33 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10007965.6 | 30.07.2010 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | DE20091035720 | 31.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009035720 | [2011/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2282273 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
G06F16/9535 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Erzeugung von über ein Mobilfunknetz erfolgenden Anfragen an Datenquellen in Kommunikationsnetzwerken sowie über ein Mobilfunknetz erfolgende Übermittlung von Antworten von Datenquellen in Kommunikationsnetzwerken auf entsprechende Anfragen | [2011/06] | English: | Generation of enquiries made to data sources in communication networks through a mobile wireless network and transmission of answers from data sources in communication networks to those enquiries made through a mobile wireless network | [2011/06] | French: | Production de demandes produites à travers un réseau radio mobile sur des sources de données dans des réseaux de communication et transmission produite à travers un réseau radio mobile de réponses de sources de données dans des réseaux de communication aux demandes correspondantes | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 24.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 09.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.09.2020 | 03.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/27] | 27.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03079655 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [I] 1-12* the whole document *; | [I]WO2008072045 (SAMPATH HARI PRASAD [IN], et al) [I] 1-12 * the whole document * | Examination | US2007106570 | - FENG GUI ET AL, "A Contextualized and Personalized Approach for Mobile Search", ADVANCED INFORMATION NETWORKING AND APPLICATIONS WORKSHOPS, 2009. WAINA '09. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090526), ISBN 978-1-4244-3999-7, pages 966 - 971, XP031480892 | by applicant | US2007198505 |