EP2290617 - Travel passenger check-in [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services GmbH Herrenacker 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mehl, Thomas, Walter, Heinrich 687 East 4th Street Brooklyn New York 11218 / US | 02 /
Frome, Eric, Allan 5255 Upper 183rd St. W. Farmington Minnesota 55024 / US | 03 /
Ranjan, Divish, Priya 13400 Gent Dr. Austin Texas 78729 / US | 04 /
Phillips, Rosalie, Mack 1259 Deerridge Ct. Eagan Minnesota 55123 / US | 05 /
Horowitz, Seth, Aaron 844 East Coatsville Ave Salt Lake City Utah 84105 / US | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10008001.9 | 30.07.2010 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | US20090550755 | 31.08.2009 Original published format: US 550755 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2290617 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2290617 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, G07B15/00, G06Q10/00 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
G06Q50/14 (EP,US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/09] | G07C9/00, G07B15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reisepassagierabfertigung | [2011/09] | English: | Travel passenger check-in | [2011/09] | French: | Enregistrement de passager | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/11] | 02.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0163533 (NORTHWEST AIRLINES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1, line 24 - page 5, line 24 * * page 12, line 13 - page 17, line 11 * * figures 2a-14 *; | [I]WO0038091 (IMPRESSE CORP [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 13, line 30 - page 17, line 28 * * figures 5-6 *; | [I]US2007061182 (BROOKS PATRICK J [CA], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 2, paragraph 18 - page 3, paragraph 25 * |