EP2293202 - Device and method for providing an updateable web page by means of a visible and invisible pane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polycom Israel Ltd. Derech Em Hamoshavot 94, P.O. Box 3654 49130 Petach Tikva / IL | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boneh, Rami 355 Troon Court Loisville, CO 80027 / US | 02 /
Biby, Danny 75 Daniel Liphsitz st Ramat-Ganim Gimel Petach-Tikva, 49776 / IL | 03 /
Eliraz, Zoe BOB 1066 Yavniel, 15225 / IL | [2015/14] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
Boneh, Rami 355 Troon Court Loisville CO 80027 / US | ||
02 /
Biby, Danny 75 Daniel Liphsitz st Ramat Ganim Gimel Petach-Tikva 49776 / IL | |||
03 /
Zoe Eliraz BOB 1066 Yavniel 15225 / IL | |||
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Boneh, Rami 21/1 Mitzva Dani Street 48057 Rosh Ha'ayin / IL | ||
02 /
Biby, Danny 7 Jerusalem Blvd. 52371 Ramat Gan / IL | |||
03 /
Rotkovitch, Rivka 5 Toledano Street 49501 Petach Tikva / IL | Representative(s) | Käck, Stefan, et al Kahler Käck Mollekopf Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Käck, Jürgen Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Käck, Jürgen Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | Application number, filing date | 10008066.2 | 27.02.2001 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US20000186417P | 02.03.2000 Original published format: US 186417 P | US20000675798 | 28.09.2000 Original published format: US 675798 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2293202 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2293202 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
H04L65/4038 (EP);
H04L12/1827 (EP);
H04L43/00 (EP);
H04L67/02 (EP);
H04L67/306 (EP);
H04L67/535 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2011/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung einer aktualisierbaren Webseite mittels einem sichtbaren und unsichtbaren Abschnitt | [2015/31] | English: | Device and method for providing an updateable web page by means of a visible and invisible pane | [2011/10] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la mise à disposition de pages Web actualisables realisé par un paneau visible et un paneau invisible | [2011/10] |
Former [2011/10] | Apparat und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung einer aktualisierbaren Webseite mittels einer sichtbaren und unsichtbaren Ebene | Examination procedure | 06.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 18.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01908095.1 / EP1269336 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010908095) is 31.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.07.2015 | BE | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | ES | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | IT | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | IE | 27.02.2016 | LU | 27.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | FR | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/28] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
GR | 30.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [IP] - INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, "Updating live HTML pages incrementally with data from Web Servers", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (20000501), vol. 433, no. 95, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007126141 [IP] 1-7 * the whole document * | [I] - TESSIER T, "SHARING DATA BETWEEN WEB PAGE FRAMES USING JAVASCRIPT IMPLEMENTING A HIDDEN-FRAME TECHNIQUE", DR. DOBB'S JOURNAL, M&T PUBL., REDWOOD CITY, CA,, US, (19960501), vol. 21, no. 5, ISSN 1044-789X, pages 72,74 - 75,86, XP000575401 [I] 1-7 * example 3 * | [I] - FRIESENHAHN B, "WRITING JAVASCRIPT APPLICATIONS", BYTE, MCGRAW-HILL INC. ST PETERBOROUGH, US, (199802), vol. 23, no. 2, ISSN 0360-5280, pages 59 - 60, XP000767988 [I] 1-7 * page 60, column 1, paragraph 2 * | by applicant | US20000186002 |