EP2315083 - Vibrating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Think Love LLC 147 Old Country Road Hicksville NY 11801 / US | [2011/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schultz, Jonathan Paul 2/F 140 Che keng Tuk Road, Sai Kung N.T. Hong-Kong / CN | 02 /
Hindle, Chris John Westering, Ranmoor Hill Hathersage, Derbyshire, S32 1BU / GB | 03 /
Gough, Keith Adrian G/F, 104 Jade Villa, Sai-Kung Hong-Kong / CN | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Díaz de Bustamante y Terminel, Isidro Arcade & Asociados C/ Isabel Colbrand, 6-5th floor 28050 Madrid / ES | [2011/17] | Application number, filing date | 10008286.6 | 09.08.2010 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | US20090539621 | 12.08.2009 Original published format: US 539621 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2315083 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2315083 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G04G13/02, G04G21/00 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
G04G13/02 (EP,US);
G04G21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vibrationsvorrichtung | [2011/17] | English: | Vibrating device | [2011/17] | French: | Dispositif vibrant | [2011/17] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/50] | 23.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 28.12.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 28.12.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]GB2424082 (LEGGETT ANDREW [GB]) [I] 1,2 * page 5, line 24 - page 10, line 30; figures 2,4 * [A] 3; | [Y]US6898155 (NORMAN CARY A [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 34 - column 6, line 19; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]DE10238250 (GROS HEIKO [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003]; claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]US2003151982 (BREWER DONALD R [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] * |