EP2311601 - Method and device for detecting the sharpness of cutter blades on a chaff cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Saulgau GmbH Zeppelinstrasse 2 88348 Bad Saulgau / DE | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loebe, Stefan Kolbenäcker 34 88348 Bad Saulgau / DE | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/32] | Application number, filing date | 10008409.4 | 12.08.2010 | [2011/16] | Priority number, date | DE20091049265 | 13.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009049265 | [2011/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311601 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2311601 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B24B3/36, A01F29/09, A01D43/08 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
A01F29/22 (EP);
A01D43/085 (EP);
B24B3/363 (EP);
B24B3/368 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/16] | B24B3/36, A01F29/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erkennung der Schneidschärfe von Häckselmessern eines Feldhäckslers | [2011/16] | English: | Method and device for detecting the sharpness of cutter blades on a chaff cutter | [2011/16] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de reconnaissance du tranchant de hache-pailles d'une récolteuse-hacheuse | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 22.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2010 | AL | 08.08.2012 | CY | 08.08.2012 | CZ | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | FI | 08.08.2012 | HR | 08.08.2012 | IT | 08.08.2012 | LT | 08.08.2012 | LV | 08.08.2012 | MK | 08.08.2012 | MT | 08.08.2012 | NL | 08.08.2012 | PL | 08.08.2012 | RO | 08.08.2012 | SE | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | SM | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | IE | 12.08.2012 | LU | 12.08.2012 | BE | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | FR | 08.10.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | NO | 08.11.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | ES | 19.11.2012 | IS | 08.12.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
AL | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
SM | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 12.08.2012 | ||
LU | 12.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 08.10.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
SM | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 12.08.2012 | ||
LU | 12.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 08.10.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 12.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 08.10.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 12.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 08.10.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 12.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 08.10.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 12.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 12.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/27] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 08.08.2012 | |
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 08.08.2012 | |
NO | 08.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1386534 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-21* paragraph [0032]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1522214 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-21 * column 10; figures 1-3 * |