EP2256540 - Display apparatus and method of fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2012/45] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | ||
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Yu-Jin 610, Crystal town Beach dong Myeongam-ri Tangjeong-myeon Asan-si, Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Su-Jeong B-201, Namsan Neovillage Apt. 7-32 Galwol-dong Yongsan-gu, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Baek, Ju-Hyeon 101- 804, Wolbong Byeoksan taeyoung Apt. 1538 Ssangyong-dong Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Beom-Jun 82-13, Yangjae-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | 05 /
Lee, Myung-Sub 214-508, Hangaram Apt. Ichon 1-dong Yongsan-gu, Seoul / KR | 06 /
Jeong, Ji-Young 108-503 Hoban Regencyvill Apt. Buldang-dong Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 07 /
Lee, Yun-Seok 103-803, Gyereong Rishivill Apt. 1078 Dujeong-dong Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | [2013/26] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Kim, Yu-Jin 610, Crystal town Beach dong Myeongam-ri Tangjeong-myeon Asan-si, Chungcheongnam-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Su-Jeong B-201, Namsan Neovillage Apt. 7-32 Galwol-dong Yongsan-gu, Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
Baek, Ju-Hyeon 101- 804, Wolbong Byeoksan taeyoung Apt. 1538 Ssangyong-dong Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | |||
04 /
Kim, Beom-Jun 82-13, Yangjae-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | |||
05 /
Lee, Myung-Sub 214-508, Hangaram Apt. Ichon 1-dong Yongsan-gu, Seoul / KR | |||
06 /
Jeong, Ji-Young 108-503 Hoban Regencyvill Apt. Buldang-dong Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | |||
07 /
Lee, Yun-Seok 103-803, Gyereong Rishivill Apt. 1078 Dujeong-dong Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | Representative(s) | Weitzel, Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Weitzel, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Weitzel, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10008907.7 | 30.10.2007 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | KR20060106668 | 31.10.2006 Original published format: KR 20060106668 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2256540 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2256540 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256540 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133, G02F1/1333, G02F1/1339, G06F3/041 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
G02F1/13394 (EP,US);
G02F1/1339 (KR);
G02F1/13338 (EP,US);
G06F3/0412 (EP,US);
G06F3/045 (KR);
G06F3/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2010/48] | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2010/48] | English: | Display apparatus and method of fabricating the same | [2010/48] | French: | Appareil d'affichage et son procédé de fabrication | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 04.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07021170.1 / EP1918765 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070021170) is 22.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6501529 (KURIHARA MIKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,6-9 * column 1, line 29 - line 40 * * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 17; figures 8,9; claim 1 *; | [A]US2002075443 (SHIMIZU HIROMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,7-10 * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] , [0078]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2006109222 (LEE JOO-HYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-3,8,9 * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0173] * * paragraph [0186] - paragraph [0194]; figures 10-12,14 *; | [A]US2006102462 (BOURDELAIS ROBERT P [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0072] * |