EP2292360 - Method of and apparatus for removing a metal oxide from a treating surface of a substrate ; Method of reducing metal oxides and forming a solder joint in a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/10] | Method for the removal of surface oxides by electron attachment | ||
[2015/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dong, Chun Christine 2288 Boulder Circle 18062 Macungie PA / US | 02 /
Ghosh, Ranajit 6803 Goor Street 18062 Macungie PA / US | 03 /
Arslanian, Gregory Khosrov 6005 Planters Drive 18947 Pipersville PA / US | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10009084.4 | 01.09.2010 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US20090239252P | 02.09.2009 Original published format: US 239252 P | US20100857156 | 16.08.2010 Original published format: US 857156 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292360 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292360 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/008, B23K1/20, B23K35/38, C23G5/00, H01L21/00, H05K3/26, H05K3/34, H01L21/02 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
B23K1/008 (EP,US);
B23K1/206 (EP,US);
B23K35/262 (EP,US);
B23K35/38 (EP,US);
C23G5/00 (EP,US);
H01L21/02068 (EP,US);
H01L21/4864 (EP,US);
H01L21/67069 (EP,US);
H05K3/3489 (EP,US);
B23K2101/40 (EP,US);
C21D9/50 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0102 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01077 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01087 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,US);
H05K2203/087 (EP,US);
H05K2203/105 (EP,US);
H05K3/3457 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2011/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von metallischem Oxyd von einer behandelten Oberfläche eines Substrates ; Verfahren zum Reduzieren von metallischen Oxyden und Herstellen einer Lötverbindung in einem Substrat | [2015/10] | English: | Method of and apparatus for removing a metal oxide from a treating surface of a substrate ; Method of reducing metal oxides and forming a solder joint in a substrate | [2015/05] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour éliminer un oxyde métallique d'une surface traitée d'un substrat ; Procédé pour réduire les oxydes métalliques et réaliser un joint de brasage dans un substrat | [2015/05] |
Former [2011/10] | Verfahren zum Entfernen von Oberflächenoxiden mittels Elektronenanlagerung | ||
Former [2011/10] | Method for the removal of surface oxides by electron attachment | ||
Former [2011/10] | Procédé pour l'élimination d'oxydes de surface par transfert d'électrons | Examination procedure | 19.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 13.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.12.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2010 | AL | 17.06.2015 | AT | 17.06.2015 | BE | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | ES | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | HR | 17.06.2015 | IT | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | MK | 17.06.2015 | MT | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | SE | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | SM | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | IE | 01.09.2015 | LU | 01.09.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | NO | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.09.2010 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 01.09.2010 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XPA]EP2119526 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [XP] 1,4-15 * abstract * [A] 2,3; | [XA]EP1475179 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US], et al) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0060] - [0063]; figures 5-6; claim - * [A] 1-14; | [A]EP1473105 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1,14,15 * abstract *; | [A]US2004226914 (DONG CHUN CHRISTINE [US], et al) [A] 2 * paragraph [0042]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US5409543 | US6203637 | US6146503 | US6089445 | US6021940 | US6007637 | US5941448 | US5858312 | US5722581 | US5433820 |