EP2292575 - Process for the separation of 1,1,1,2,3,3-hexafluoropropane (HFC-236ea) from an azeotropic or near-azeotropic composition of HFC-236ea with hydrogen fluoride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Ralph, Newton 39 Hillstream Road Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | 02 /
Nappa, Mario, Joseph 3 Oakridge Court Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | 03 /
Rao, Velliyur, Nott, Mallikarjuna 1 Georgetown Avenue Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10009450.7 | 01.11.2006 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US20050732041P | 01.11.2005 Original published format: US 732041 P | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292575 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/383, C07C21/18 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
C07C21/18 (EP,KR,US);
C01B7/196 (EP,KR,US);
C07C17/25 (EP,KR,US);
C07C17/38 (EP,KR,US);
C07C17/383 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/25, C07C21/18 (EP,US);
C07C17/383, C07C21/18 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2011/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abtrennung von 1,1,1,2,3,3-Hexafluoropropan (HFC-236ea) aus einer azeotropische- oder nah-azeotropische Mischung von HFC-236ea mit Fluorwasserstoff | [2011/10] | English: | Process for the separation of 1,1,1,2,3,3-hexafluoropropane (HFC-236ea) from an azeotropic or near-azeotropic composition of HFC-236ea with hydrogen fluoride | [2011/10] | French: | Procedé pour la séparation de 1,1,1,2,3,3-hexafluoropropane (HFC-236ea) a partir d'une composition azeotropique ou semi-azeotropique contenant du HFC-236ea et du fluorure d'hydrogène | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 11.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 13.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06827293.9 / EP1948579 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060827293) is 04.09.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.06.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9532935 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5616275 (CHISOLM TUNEEN E C [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1028152 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US6369284 (NAPPA MARIO JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * examples 1-9; claim - *; | [AP]US2006094911 (RAO VELLIYUR N M [US], et al) [AP] 1-4* the whole document *; | [X] - Perry's chemical engineering handbook, Mc Graw-Hill, (19970101), pages 13-72 - 13-73, ISBN 0-07-115448-5, XP002617165 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0885863 | WO9926908 | US2003208090 | by applicant | US4978649 | US5396000 | US5679875 | US6031141 | US6369284 | US6388147 | - W. SCHOTTE, IND. ENG. CHEM. PROCESS DES. DEV., (1980), vol. 19, pages 432 - 439 | - HAROLD R. NULL, Phase Equilibrium in Process Design, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHER, (1970), pages 124 - 126 | - REID; PRAUSNITZ; POLING, The Properties of Gases and Liquids, MCGRAW HILL, pages 241 - 387 | - STANLEY M. WALAS, Phase Equilibria in Chemical Engineering, BUTTERWORTH PUBLISHERS, (1985), pages 165 - 244 |