EP2254262 - Diversity transmission modes for MIMO OFMD communication systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walton, Jay R. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
Ketchum, John W. 37 Candleberry Lane Harvard, MA 01451 / US | [2010/47] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10009464.8 | 20.06.2003 | [2010/47] | Priority number, date | US20020179439 | 24.06.2002 Original published format: US 179439 | [2010/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2254262 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2254262 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H04L27/26, H04L1/06, H04B7/06, H04J11/00, H04L1/00 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
H04L5/0028 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0413 (KR);
H04B7/04 (EP,US);
H04B7/0669 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0678 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0697 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0001 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0618 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/26 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | Diversitätssendemodi für MIMO-OFDM-Kommunikationssysteme | [2010/47] | English: | Diversity transmission modes for MIMO OFMD communication systems | [2010/47] | French: | Modes de transmission de diversité pour systèmes de communication MIMO OFDM | [2010/47] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 26.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/29] | 08.06.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2015 | 10.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03761177.9 / EP1516441 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030761177) is 11.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5914933 (CIMINI LEONARD JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 17; figure 1A * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 16; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO0176110 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 3 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 21 * * page 11, line 3 - line 14 * * page 12, line 5 - page 13, line 11 * * page 18, line 21 - page 19, line 13 * * page 27, line 18 - page 28, line 5 * * page 32, line 12 - line 29; figure 3 * * claims 1,8-10 *; | [A]EP1158716 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] ** paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP1182799 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0048] * | by applicant | - S.M. ALAMOUTI, "A Simple Transmit Diversity Technique for Wireless Communications", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (199810), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 1451 - 1458 | US20000532492 | US20010737602 | US20010776075 | US20010854235 | US20010826481 | US20010993087 | US20020085456 |