EP2256783 - Thin plate supporting container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miraial Co., Ltd. 18-2, Nishi-Ikebukuro 1-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsutori, Chiaki Kumamoto Plant Miraial Col., Ltd. 34, Aza-Imadera Oaza-Yoshitomi Shisui Kikuchi Kumamoto / JP | 02 /
Obayashi, Tadahiro Kumamoto Plant Miraial Col., Ltd. 34, Aza-Imadera Oaza-Yoshitomi Shisui Kikuchi Kumamoto / JP | [2012/06] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
Matsutori, Chiaki Kumamoto Plant Miraial Col., Ltd. 34, Aza-Imadera Oaza-Yoshitomi Shisui Kikuchi Kumamoto / JP | ||
02 /
Obayashi, Tadahiro Kumamoto Plant Miraial Col., Ltd. 34, Aza-Imadera Oaza-Yoshitomi Shisui Kikuchi Kumamoto / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10009630.4 | 23.12.2003 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | JP20020379340 | 27.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002379340 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256783 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256783 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
H01L21/67373 (EP,US);
H01L21/68 (KR);
H01L21/67379 (EP,US);
H01L21/67383 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/48] | Title | German: | Behälter für dünne Scheiben | [2010/48] | English: | Thin plate supporting container | [2010/48] | French: | Conteneur de plaquettes fines | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 22.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03029812.9 / EP1434256 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030029812) is 24.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1004524 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0058] *; | [Y]US6039186 (BHATT SANJIV M [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 3, line 60 - column 5, line 59 *; | [A]GB2324413 (FLUOROWARE INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]GB2338924 (FLUOROWARE INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]DE19848147 (FLUOROWARE INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9939994 |