EP2439644 - Method for marking screen pages that are secure and not secure on a display device using an optical marker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pixy AG Schiffmühlestrasse 7 5417 Untersiggenthal / CH | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gruenert, David Manuel Giesserstrasse 2 8406 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Haag, Stephan Am Rummelbach 14 8965 Berikon / CH | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10009933.2 | 20.09.2010 | [2012/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2439644 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2439644 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/22, G06F11/16, G09G3/00, G06F11/267 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
G06F11/162 (EP);
G09G3/006 (EP);
G09G2330/12 (EP);
G09G2358/00 (EP);
G09G2380/10 (EP);
G09G5/36 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/15] | G06F11/16, G09G3/00, G06F11/267 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kennzeichnung sicherheitsrelevanter und nichtsicherheitsrelevanter Bildschirmseiten auf einem Anzeigegerät mittels eines optischen Markers | [2012/15] | English: | Method for marking screen pages that are secure and not secure on a display device using an optical marker | [2012/15] | French: | Procédé de marquage de pages d'écran relatives et non relatives à la sécurité sur un appareil d'affichage à l'aide d'un marqueur optique | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 05.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.2013
14.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Bombardier Transportation GmbH Schöneberger Ufer 1 10785 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB (Gävle), et al, et al Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | 02
20.12.2013
17.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE DEUTA-WERKE GmbH Paffratherstrasse 140 51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE Opponent's representative Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2018/01] |
Former [2014/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.2013
Bombardier Transportation GmbH Schöneberger Ufer 1 10785 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Olsson, Jan, et al, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O.Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | ||
02
20.12.2013
ADMISSIBLE DEUTA-WERKE GmbH Paffratherstrasse 140 51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE Opponent's representative Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 29.01.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.08.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.07.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 31.10.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/01] | Appeal following opposition | 26.09.2017 | Appeal received No. T2239/17 | 28.11.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.10.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2010 | AL | 20.03.2013 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | DK | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | HR | 20.03.2013 | IT | 20.03.2013 | LT | 20.03.2013 | LV | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | MK | 20.03.2013 | MT | 20.03.2013 | NL | 20.03.2013 | PL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SE | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | SM | 20.03.2013 | TR | 20.03.2013 | BG | 20.06.2013 | NO | 20.06.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | ES | 01.07.2013 | IS | 20.07.2013 | PT | 22.07.2013 | IE | 20.09.2013 | LU | 20.09.2013 | BE | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | GB | 20.09.2014 | AT | 20.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2019/40] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 20.09.2010 | |
AL | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MK | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
SM | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
LU | 20.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
GB | 20.09.2014 | ||
AT | 20.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/17] | HU | 20.09.2010 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MK | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
SM | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
LU | 20.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
GB | 20.09.2014 | ||
AT | 20.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | HU | 20.09.2010 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MK | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
SM | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
LU | 20.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
GB | 20.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 20.09.2010 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MK | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
SM | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
LU | 20.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MK | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
SM | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
SM | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
NO | 20.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007054275 (DIEHL AEROSPACE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 1, line 32 - page 3, line 28 *; | [A]US2004145598 (PARENT GERSHON [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]WO2007071378 (VOSSLOH INFORMATION TECHNOLOGI [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 17, line 10 - page 20, line 4 *; | [A]WO2007033902 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 26 * | by applicant | DE102005011942 | DE102004039498 | DE10252124 |