EP2275081 - Personal care compositions with portable packs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PBL Technology Limited 41 Veronica St New Lynn Auckland 1003 / NZ | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alexander, Carl Ernest Church House High Halden, Kent TN26 3JB / GB | 02 /
Grayson, Francis William 50 Orakei Road Rumera Auckland 1005 / NZ | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Andrew, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | Bentham, Andrew, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10009995.1 | 29.01.2004 | [2011/03] | Priority number, date | NZ20030523946 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: NZ 52394603 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2275081 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/73, A61Q11/00, A61Q19/00 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
A45D40/24 (EP,US);
A61K8/02 (KR);
A61K8/0216 (EP,US);
A61K8/65 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/733 (EP,US);
A61K8/735 (EP,US);
A61K8/736 (EP,US);
A61K8/737 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A45D33/006 (EP,US);
A45D40/0087 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | Körperpflegende Zusammensetzungen mit tragbaren Verpackungen | [2011/03] | English: | Personal care compositions with portable packs | [2011/03] | French: | Compositions de soins personels avec emballages portatifs | [2011/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 22.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 01.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04001866.5 / EP1444975 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040001866) is 12.08.2005 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   11.07.2012 | 31.01.2013 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   15.07.2013 | 31.01.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB750126 (MACLEANS LTD) [AD] 1-14 * page 3, column L, line 20 - line 45; example - *; | [A]GB1206163 (ASPRO NICHOLAS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-14 * claim - *; | [A]EP0548814 (AKUTAGAWA CONFECTIONERY [JP]) [A] 1-14 * figure -; claim - *; | [YD]DE4238421 (KRASS B F DR [DE]) [YD] 1-14 * claim - * * column 2, line 14 - line 37 * * column 4, line 6 - line 42 *; | [YD]EP0711544 (KAO CORP [JP]) [YD] 1-14 * example - * * page 2, line 48 - line 50 * * page 3, line 26 - line 56 * * page 4, line 29 - line 37 * * page 7, line 3 - line 10 *; | [X]US5961990 (DELRIEU PASCAL [FR], et al) [X] 1-14 * example - * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 34 * * column 10, line 6 - line 41 * * column 12, line 25 - line 40 * * column 13, line 8 - line 26 * * column 5 - column 12, line 17; claim - *; | [A]US6077544 (DEBREGEAS PATRICE [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 1 - line 35 * * column 4, line 50 - line 63 *; | [Y]DE20014157U (BAUMGARTNER IRENE [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 13 - line 20 * * page 2, line 13 - page 4, line 6 * * page 4, line 22 - line 31 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 7 * * example - *; | [A]JP2002179140 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]FR2822700 (DANA FREDERIC [FR]) [A] 1-14 * example -; claim - * | by applicant | GB720720 | GB750126 | EP0179166 | US5094839 | US5213428 | DE4238421 | EP0711544 | WO03059302 | WO2001IB02772 |