EP2259223 - Character displaying method for adding visual effect to a character when the character is input and mobile station therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Tae-Young c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Dong-Uk c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Han, Myoung-Hwan c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Seo, Jin-Gyu c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Hong, Nho-Kyung c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Lee, Chang-Hoon c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10010092.4 | 16.05.2006 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | KR20050046918 | 01.06.2005 Original published format: KR 20050046918 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2259223 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2259223 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/60, G06T15/70, G06F17/21, G06T15/20, G06T11/20, H04M1/725, // H04M1/725 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
G06T11/001 (EP,US);
G06F40/109 (EP,US);
G06T11/203 (EP);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04M1/72427 (EP,US);
H04M1/72448 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Zeichendarstellung zum Hinzufügen eines visuellen Effekts zu einem Zeichen wenn das Zeichen eingegeben wird und zugehöriges mobiles Endgerät | [2010/49] | English: | Character displaying method for adding visual effect to a character when the character is input and mobile station therefor | [2010/49] | French: | Méthode d'affichage de caractères pour addition d'un effet visuel à un caractère quand le caractère est entré et dispositif mobile associé | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 12.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/42] | 01.04.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/42] | 27.05.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06010089.8 / EP1729262 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060010089) is 01.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0880090 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1,7,12,14 * abstract * * column 4, lines 32-48 * * column 10, line 5 - column 11, line 42 *; | [X]EP0902378 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10-13 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0047] - [0049] * * figures 14,15 *; | [Y]US6057858 (DESROSIERS JOHN J [US]) [Y] 5,7,8,15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 4-23 * * column 3, lines 61-65 * * column 5, lines 48-53 * * column 6, lines 23-29 * * column 7, line 47 - column 8, line 8 * * column 20, line 36 - column 21, line 23 * * column 24, lines 25-37 * * column 31, lines 44-55 *; | [Y]US6091505 (BEAMAN ALEXANDER B [US], et al) [Y] 4,13 * figures 1-3 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 29 *; | [XY]US6504545 (BROWNE CAMERON BOLITHO [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9-14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-8 * * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 2 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 8 * * column 11, lines 1-11,57-61 * * column 12, lines 3-33 * * column 12, line 63 - column 13, line 5 * * column 13, lines 52-55 * * column 14, lines 12-14 * [Y] 4,5,7,8,13,15; | [Y]US2003110450 (SAKAI RYUTARO [US]) [Y] 7,8 * abstract ** paragraph [0011] *; | [X]US2004135818 (THOMSON MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0013] , [0032] - [0036] - [0039] * | Examination | - Microsoft, "Microsoft Unveils Integrated E-Mail, Word and Excel for the Pocket PC Next-Generation Mobile Devices Put Business Productivity in Users' Pockets", - Today at the Mobile Insights 2000 Conference, Palm Desert, (20000307), URL: http://www.microsoft.com/en-us/news/press/2000/mar00/pocketwordpr.aspx, (20131127), XP055090592 |