EP2336351 - Method of selectively determining glycated hemoglobin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [2015/33] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Arkray, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yonehara, Satoshi c/o ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [2016/10] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
Yonehara, Satoshi c/o ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishi Aketa-cho Higashi-kujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | Representative(s) | Golding, Louise Ann Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2016/10] |
Former [2011/25] | Golding, Louise Ann Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10010191.4 | 12.07.2001 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | JP20000214801 | 14.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000214801 | [2011/25] | Previously filed application, date | WO2001JP06064 | 12.07.2001 | [2011/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2336351 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2336351 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2336351 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/26, G01N33/72 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
C12Q1/26 (EP,US);
C12Q1/37 (EP,US);
G01N33/723 (EP,US);
G01N33/725 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/10] |
Former [2011/25] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Verfahren zur selektiven Bestimmung von glykiertem Hämoglobin | [2011/25] | English: | Method of selectively determining glycated hemoglobin | [2011/25] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer de manière sélective d'hémoglobine glyquée | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 02.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 11.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.05.2015 | 04.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 20.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01947995.5 / EP1304385 | Divisional application(s) | EP15174619.5 / EP2944699 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010947995) is 21.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9713872 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,11-15 * page 22, line 17 - page 23, line 12; claim 18; tables 3,4 * * page 29, line 2 - line 5 * [I] 5,7,9,10; | [A]US5631140 (KOBOLD UWE [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1002874 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * Paragraphs [0004]; [0029]; [0030]; [0050]; [0051]. *; | [T] - SAKURABAYASHI I ET AL, "NEW ENZYMATIC ASSAY FOR GLYCOHEMOGLOBIN", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, (20030101), vol. 49, no. 2, doi:10.1373/49.2.269, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 269 - 274, XP009008806 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/49.2.269 |