EP2259099 - Triangular-pyramidal cube-corner retroreflective article having curved reflective lateral face [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/49] | Triangular-pyramidal cube-corner retroreflective article having curved reflective lateral face | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Carbide Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 11-19, Kohnan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8466 / JP | [2014/45] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Nippon Carbide Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 11-1, 9Kohnan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8466 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mimura, Ikuo 3700-5, Butsuden Uozu-shi Toyama 937-0061 / JP | [2014/45] |
Former [2011/05] | 01 /
Mimura, Ikuo 3700-5, Butsuden Uozu-shi Toyama 937-0061 / JP | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/45] |
Former [2010/49] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10010210.2 | 02.12.2004 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | JP20030402393 | 02.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003402393 | JP20040006445 | 14.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004006445 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2259099 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2259099 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, G02B5/124 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
G02B5/124 (EP,US);
G02B5/122 (KR);
B29D11/00605 (EP,US);
Y10T409/502624 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2457 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/49] | G02B5/122, G02B5/124 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Würfelecken-Retroreflexionsartikel des Dreieck-Pyramidentyps mit gekrümmter Reflexionsseitenoberfläche | [2014/45] | English: | Triangular-pyramidal cube-corner retroreflective article having curved reflective lateral face | [2014/45] | French: | Article retroreflechissant sous forme de cube pyramidal triangulaire possedant une surface laterale reflechissante incurvee | [2014/45] |
Former [2010/49] | Würfelecken-Rretroreflexionsartikel des Dreieck-Pyramidentyps mit gekrümmter Reflexionsseitenoberfläche | ||
Former [2010/49] | Triangular-pyramidal cube-corner retroreflective article having curved reflective lateral face | ||
Former [2010/49] | Article retroreflechissant sous forme de cube pyramidal triangulaire possedant une surface laterale reflechissante incurvee | Examination procedure | 06.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 28.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04819975.6 / EP1698915 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040819975) is 10.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2004 | AT | 05.11.2014 | BG | 05.11.2014 | CY | 05.11.2014 | CZ | 05.11.2014 | DK | 05.11.2014 | EE | 05.11.2014 | FI | 05.11.2014 | LT | 05.11.2014 | MC | 05.11.2014 | NL | 05.11.2014 | PL | 05.11.2014 | RO | 05.11.2014 | SE | 05.11.2014 | SI | 05.11.2014 | SK | 05.11.2014 | TR | 05.11.2014 | IE | 02.12.2014 | LU | 02.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | GR | 06.02.2015 | IS | 05.03.2015 | PT | 05.03.2015 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.12.2004 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 05.11.2014 | |
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 05.11.2014 | |
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 05.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02101423 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0153858 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 8 - page 9; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH05150368 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2001081737 (THREE M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2310790 | US3712706 | EP0137736 | US5138488 | EP0548280 | US4775219 | US5171624 | US5565151 | WO9818028 | WO0052503 | WO9954760 | JP2001264525 | US6318866 | US3190178 | US4025159 | JPS5028669U |