EP2320657 - Motion picture encoding and decoding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Yoshihisa c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Moriya, Yoshimi c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
Sugimoto, Kazuo c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
Asai, Kohtaro c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10010356.3 | 27.12.2002 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | JP20020000516 | 07.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002000516 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2320657 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2320657 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/30, H04N7/50 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
H04N19/137 (EP,US);
H04N19/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,US);
H04N19/107 (EP,US);
H04N19/112 (EP,US);
H04N19/122 (EP,US);
H04N19/126 (EP,US);
H04N19/129 (EP,US);
H04N19/13 (EP,US);
H04N19/159 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/196 (EP,US);
H04N19/197 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/463 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/19] | H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [2011/19] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kodierung und Dekodiervorrichtung von bewegten Bildern | [2011/19] | English: | Motion picture encoding and decoding apparatus | [2011/19] | French: | Appareil de codage et de décodage d'images en mouvement | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 16.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 25.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02792070.1 / EP1370087 | EP08018821.2 / EP2026583 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020792070) is 18.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0762777 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 25 - column 6, line 42 * * column 19, line 29 - column 23, line 32 * * figures 1b,2,3,5,16,17 *; | [X]EP0797356 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 1,5 * * page 2, line 50 - page 5, line 2 *; | [A]EP1032213 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0043] - [0055] *; | [X] - WITH DE P H N, "MOTION-ADAPTIVE INTRAFRAME TRANSFORM CODING OF VIDEO SIGNALS", PHILIPS JOURNAL OF RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19890728), vol. 44, no. 2/3, ISSN 0165-5817, pages 345 - 364, XP000053343 [X] 1 * pages 348-353, paragraph 3 * * figure 1 * | [X] - MATHIAS WIEN, "Adaptive Block Transforms (ABT)", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), 13TH MEETING, AUSTIN, TX, USA, 2-4 APRIL 2001, (20010328), no. VCEG-M62, pages 1 - 7, XP030003232 [X] 1 * the whole document * |