EP2258425 - Medication injector apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/49] | Medication injector apparatus with drive assembly that facilitates reset | ||
[2012/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eli Lilly and Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atterbury, William Godwin 397 Bailey Place Columbus, OH 43235 / US | 02 /
Diller, Mark Gerard 701 Clinton Street Clayton, OH 45315 / US | 03 /
Gaydos, Peter Andrew 2384 Stewart Hollow Court Hilliard, OH 43026 / US | 04 /
Hoste, Shannon Marie-Lynn 7088 Greenery Court Westerville, OH 43082 / US | 05 /
Taylor, Donna Marie 1076 Baumock Burn Drive Columbus, OH 43235 / US | 06 /
Walters, Bobby Lee 4307 Kenridge Drive Columbus, OH 43220 / US | 07 /
Madland, Steven Michael 215 Buttonwood Court Gahanna, OH 43230 / US | 08 /
Boyd, Douglas Edward 5591 Donnally Court Dublin, OH 43016 / US | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2013/05] |
Former [2010/49] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10010748.1 | 08.05.2002 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | US20010291437 | 16.05.2001 Original published format: US 291437 | US20010297051P | 08.06.2001 Original published format: US 297051 P | US20010303613P | 06.07.2001 Original published format: US 303613 P | US20010324199P | 21.09.2001 Original published format: US 324199 P | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2258425 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2258425 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2258425 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/315, A61M5/28, F15B15/28 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
A61M5/31535 (EP,US);
A61M5/31551 (EP,US);
A61M5/31566 (US);
A61M5/31585 (EP,US);
G01D5/2497 (EP,US);
G01D5/25 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00482 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2407 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2488 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3125 (EP,US);
A61M2205/50 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (EP,US);
A61M2205/585 (EP,US);
A61M2205/60 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6027 (EP,US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/3129 (EP,US);
A61M5/31543 (EP,US);
A61M5/31556 (EP,US);
A61M5/31558 (EP,US);
A61M5/31568 (EP,US);
A61M5/31573 (EP,US);
A61M5/31575 (EP,US);
A61M5/31593 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Spritzvorrichtung | [2012/26] | English: | Medication injector apparatus | [2012/26] | French: | Appareil injecteur de médication | [2012/26] |
Former [2010/49] | Spritzvorrichtung mit Antriebseinrichtung, welche Rückstellung vereinfacht | ||
Former [2010/49] | Medication injector apparatus with drive assembly that facilitates reset | ||
Former [2010/49] | Appareil injecteur de médication avec ensemble d'entraînement qui facilite le réarmement | Examination procedure | 12.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 21.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02746307.4 / EP1392377 | EP06126846.2 / EP1776975 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020746307) is 26.10.2005 | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/02] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.01.2013 | BE | 30.01.2013 | CY | 30.01.2013 | DK | 30.01.2013 | FI | 30.01.2013 | MC | 30.01.2013 | NL | 30.01.2013 | SE | 30.01.2013 | TR | 30.01.2013 | GR | 01.05.2013 | IE | 08.05.2013 | LU | 08.05.2013 | PT | 30.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
TR | 30.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 08.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 08.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
MC | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CY | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
DK | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
PT | 30.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
FI | 30.01.2013 | ||
NL | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 30.01.2013 | |
BE | 30.01.2013 | ||
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 30.01.2013 | |
SE | 30.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 30.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0615762 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5674204 (CHANOCH LAWRENCE H [US]) [A] 1* column 4, line 26 - column 8, line 21; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0937471 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 22-25 * * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 5; figure 6 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 38; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US5509905 | US5688251 | US5954700 | US6110152 |