EP2322940 - Systems amd methods to perform assays for detecting or quantifing analytes within samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/20] | Systems amd methods to perform assays for detecting or quantifing analytes within samples | ||
[2014/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gen-Probe Incorporated 10210 Genetic Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carrick, James M. 4532 Maryland Street San Diego California 92116 / US | 02 /
Light, James P. 4535 Shooting Star Avenue Middleton, WI 53562 / US | [2014/43] |
Former [2014/33] | 01 /
Carrick, James M. 9528 Dubarry Avenue Seabrook, MD 20706 / US | ||
02 /
Light, James P. 4535 Shooting Star Avenue Middleton, WI 53562 / US | |||
Former [2014/25] | 01 /
Carrick, James M. 4532 Maryland Street San Diego, CA 92116 / US | ||
02 /
Davis, Christopher Brandon 10538 Moorland Heights Way San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
03 /
Heinz, Robert E. 5625 Guincho Court San Diego, CA 92124 / US | |||
04 /
Knight, Bryon J. 4481 Palo Verde Terrace San Diego, CA 92115 / US | |||
05 /
Lair, Gary D. 2388 Vancouver Avenue San Diego, CA 92104 / US | |||
06 /
Li, Florence F. 13653 Tiverton Road San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
07 /
Li, Haito 5055 Caminito Exquisito San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
08 /
Light, James P. 11212 Ivy Hill Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | |||
09 /
Macioszek, Jerzy A. 9107 Jones Mill Road Chevy Chase, MD 20815 / US | |||
10 /
Nguyen, Thanh N. 11829 Westview Parkway San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
11 /
Scalese, Robert F. 2829 Glenview Way Escondido, CA 92025 / US | |||
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
Carrick, James M. 4532 Maryland Street San Diego California 92116 / US | ||
02 /
Davis, Christopher Brandon 10538 Moorland Heights Way San Diego California 92121 / US | |||
03 /
Heinz, Robert E. 5625 Guincho Court San Diego California 92124 / US | |||
04 /
Knight, Bryon J. 4481 Palo Verde Terrace San Diego California 92115 / US | |||
05 /
Lair, Gary D. 2388 Vancouver Avenue San Diego California 92104 / US | |||
06 /
Li, Florence F. 13653 Tiverton Road San Diego California 92130 / US | |||
07 /
Li, Haito 5055 Caminito Exquisito San Diego California 92130 / US | |||
08 /
Light, James P. 11212 Ivy Hill Drive San Diego California 92131 / US | |||
09 /
Macioszek, Jerzy A. 9107 Jones Mill Road Chevy Chase Maryland 20815 / US | |||
10 /
Nguyen, Thanh N. 11829 Westview Parkway San Diego California 92126 / US | |||
11 /
Scalese, Robert F. 2829 Glenview Way Escondido California 92025 / US | Representative(s) | Lloyd, John Scott, et al Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Lloyd, John Scott, et al Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome, Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | ||
Former [2011/45] | Lloyd, John Scott, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/20] | Lloyd, John Scott Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10010799.4 | 10.03.2006 | [2014/44] | Priority number, date | US20050659874P | 10.03.2005 Original published format: US 659874 P | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322940 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2322940 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/02, C12Q1/68 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6813 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6851 (EP,US);
G01N21/6454 (US);
G01N21/76 (EP,US);
G01N35/00693 (EP,US);
G01N35/0092 (EP,US);
G01N35/0098 (EP,US);
G01N35/0099 (EP,US);
G01N35/025 (EP,US);
G01N35/026 (EP,US);
G01N35/028 (EP,US);
G01N35/04 (EP,US);
G01N35/1002 (EP,US);
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6419 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6421 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6432 (US);
G01N2021/6439 (US);
G01N2021/6441 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00346 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00356 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00524 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0097 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0441 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0443 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0444 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0455 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0491 (EP,US);
G01N2035/103 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0415 (EP,US);
Y10S435/808 (EP,US);
Y10S435/809 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6851, C12Q2537/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Durchführung von Tests zum Nachweis oder zur Quantifizierung von Analyten in Proben | [2014/44] | English: | Systems amd methods to perform assays for detecting or quantifing analytes within samples | [2014/44] | French: | Systèmes et procédés pour effectuer des analyses afin de détecter ou quantifier des analytes dans des échantillons | [2014/44] |
Former [2011/20] | Systeme und Verfahren zur Durchführung von Tests zum Nachweis oder zur Quantifizierung von Analyten in Proben | ||
Former [2011/20] | Systems amd methods to perform assays for detecting or quantifing analytes within samples | ||
Former [2011/20] | Systèmes et procédés pour effectuer des analyses afin de détecter ou quantifier des analytes dans des échantillons | Examination procedure | 14.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06737943.8 / EP1861721 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060737943) is 26.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2006 | AT | 29.10.2014 | BE | 29.10.2014 | BG | 29.10.2014 | CY | 29.10.2014 | CZ | 29.10.2014 | DK | 29.10.2014 | EE | 29.10.2014 | ES | 29.10.2014 | FI | 29.10.2014 | IT | 29.10.2014 | LT | 29.10.2014 | LV | 29.10.2014 | MC | 29.10.2014 | NL | 29.10.2014 | PL | 29.10.2014 | RO | 29.10.2014 | SE | 29.10.2014 | SI | 29.10.2014 | SK | 29.10.2014 | TR | 29.10.2014 | GR | 30.01.2015 | IS | 28.02.2015 | PT | 02.03.2015 | LU | 10.03.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 10.03.2006 | |
AT | 29.10.2014 | ||
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
LU | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
LU | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
LU | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 29.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002031768 (MCMILLAN WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0163] * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0170] * * paragraph [0200] - paragraph [0206] * * paragraph [0222] - paragraph [0223] * * paragraph [0233] * * figures 1-30 *; | [X]WO03067215 (APPLERA CORP [US]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XP]EP1518935 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [XP] 1-11* the whole document *; | [X] - INTERNET CITATION, (19971211), URL: http://www.ukl.uni-freiburg.de/core-facility/taqman/user_bulletin_2.pdf, (20050923), XP002346434 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4486539 | US4681840 | US4683195 | US4751177 | US4766062 | US4851330 | US4946958 | US4950613 | US5130238 | US5185439 | US5200314 | EP0547267 | US5231015 | US5234809 | US5288609 | US5399491 | US5427930 | US5455166 | US5476774 | US5539082 | US5541308 | US5585481 | US5612200 | US5639599 | US5639604 | US5756709 | US5780224 | US5804375 | US5827656 | US5837452 | US5846701 | US5849478 | US5925517 | US5928862 | US5958700 | US5994056 | US6031091 | US6066458 | US6086827 | US6150097 | US6232079 | US6361945 | US2002055116 | US6410278 | US2003036058 | US6534273 | US6541205 | US6649749 | US6691041 | US2004235138 | US2004259108 | US6849412 | US6893612 | US6911327 | US2005202491 | US2005282170 | US2006046265 | - LIZARDI, BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 6, 1988, pages 1197 | - MAHONY ET AL.: "Urine Specimens from Pregnant and Nonpregnant Women Inhibitory to Amplification of Chlamydia trachomatis Nucleic Acid by PCR, Ligase Chain Reaction, and Transcription-Mediated Amplification: Identification of Urinary Substances Associated with Inhibition and Removal of Inhibitory Activity", J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., vol. 36, no. 11, 1998, pages 3122 - 3126 | - AL-SOUD, J. CLIN. MIOROBIOL, vol. 39, no. 2, 2001, pages 485 - 493 | - WEUSTEN JOS J A M ET AL, "Principles of quantitation of viral loads using nucleic acid sequence-based amplification in combination with homogeneous detection using molecular beacons.", Nucleic Acids Research, Information Retrieval Ltd., (20020315), vol. 30, no. 6, ISSN 0305-1048, pages E26 - 1, XP002436126 | US20040825757 | US20050672609 | US20050693455 | US20050737334 |