EP2292181 - Flexible medical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conor Medsystems, Inc. 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shanley, John F. 130 Emerald Estates Ct. Emerald Hills CA 94062-4072 / US | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Diehl & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10010947.9 | 26.03.1999 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US19980079881P | 30.03.1998 Original published format: US 79881 P | US19980183555 | 29.10.1998 Original published format: US 183555 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292181 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61M29/00 (KR);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91541 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91558 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0018 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/10] | Title | German: | Biegsame medizinische Vorrichtung | [2011/10] | English: | Flexible medical device | [2011/10] | French: | Dispositif médical flexible | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 20.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07025020.4 / EP1920733 | EP99914186.4 / EP1071490 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990914186) is 23.03.2001 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9603092 (BRUN HEIDI M [IL], et al) [Y] 1-13* the whole document *; | [Y]WO9740783 (JANG G DAVID [US]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0824902 (KANESAKA NOZOMU [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 12; figure - * | by applicant | US4733665 | US4739762 | US4776337 | US4969458 | US5545210 | WO9629028 |