EP2284657 - METHOD FOR DRAGGING AND DROPPING BETWEEN MULTIPLE LAYERED WINDOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/07] | Method for dragging and dropping between multiple layered windows | ||
[2016/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ewing, David 6233 Corinth Road Long Mont, CO 80503 / US | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [2016/43] |
Former [2011/07] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10011077.4 | 16.08.2001 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | US20000672957 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: US 672957 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2284657 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2284657 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
G06F3/0486 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | G06F3/033 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/43] |
Former [2011/07] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ZIEHEN UND LOSLASSEN ZWISCHEN ÜBERLAPPENDEN FENSTERN | [2016/19] | English: | METHOD FOR DRAGGING AND DROPPING BETWEEN MULTIPLE LAYERED WINDOWS | [2016/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR TIRER-RELACHER ENTRE DES FENÊTRES À RECOUVREMENT PARTIEL | [2016/19] |
Former [2011/07] | Verfahren zum ziehen und loslassen zwischen überlappenden Fenstern | ||
Former [2011/07] | Method for dragging and dropping between multiple layered windows | ||
Former [2011/07] | Procédé pour tirer-relacher entre des fenêtres à recouvrement partiel | Examination procedure | 28.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 16.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01962391.7 / EP1325406 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010962391) is 12.04.2005 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0349459 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 5, line 3 - line 57; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0514307 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 22; figure 7 * * column 11, lines 48-53 * * column 10, lines 27-33 *; | [A]GB2339128 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 7 - line 40; figures 2,3 *; | [AP]US6184883 (BATES CARY LEE [US], et al) [AP] 1-8 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 33 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 61; figures 1,2,8,9 *; | [Y] - ANON., "Interacting with the interface", MOTIF AND CDE 2.1 STYLE GUIDE, Austin, TX, US, (199710), URL: http://nscp.upenn.edu/aix4.3html/motif/motifsg/motifsg29.htm, (20021030), XP002218977 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - ANON, "Navigating Within the Interface", MOTIF AND CDE 2.1 STYLE GUIDE (FIRST ED.), Austin, TX, US, (199710), URL: http://post.doit.wisc.edu/library/techlib/manuals/adoclib/motif/motifsg/toc.htm, (20070129), XP002614836 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - ANON, "CHAPTER 7: Data Transfer", MOTIF AND CDE 2.1 STYLE GUIDE (FIRST ED.),, (19971001), URL: http://post.doit.wisc.edu/library/techlib/manuals/adoclib/motif/motifsg/toc.htm, (20090429), XP007908385 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |