EP2306650 - A/d converter and open detection method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ariyoshi, Satoshi Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kanwasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 02 /
Tsubota, Masashi Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kanwasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10011247.3 | 28.09.2010 | [2011/14] | Priority number, date | JP20090227586 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009227586 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2306650 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2306650 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/10, // H03M1/12 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
H03M1/1076 (EP,US);
H03M1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Analog-Digital-Umwandler und Offenerkennungsverfahren dafür | [2011/14] | English: | A/d converter and open detection method thereof | [2011/14] | French: | Convertisseur analogique/numérique et son procédé de détection ouverte | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007252744 (TAKEUCHI YOSHIHARU [JP]) [X] 1-5,7 * figures 1,5,8 * * paragraphs [0049] , [0055] , [0057] , [0058] , [0060] * [I] 6; | [X]US6396426 (BALARD ERIC [FR], et al) [X] 8,9 * column 5, lines 51-54; figures 2,4; claims 7,12 * * column 6, lines 25-26 * * column 6, lines 10-13 * * column 6, lines 12-13 * * column 6, lines 16-18 * * column 9, lines 41-43 * * column 9, lines 47-50 * * column 9, lines 51-53 * * column 9, lines 57-64 * | by applicant | JP2009227586 | JP2005184118 |