EP2308908 - Aqueous dispersion of a heat hardened polyurethane composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jansen, Bernhard Kekuléstr. 19 51061 Köln / DE | [2014/26] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states Jansen, Bernhard Kekuléstr. 19 51061 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Hüttermann, Aloys Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2014/25] | Application number, filing date | 10011396.8 | 29.09.2010 | [2011/15] | Priority number, date | DE20091048945 | 10.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009048945 | [2011/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2308908 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2308908 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/61, C08G18/80, C08F220/24, C09D133/16, C08G18/08, C08G18/28, C08G18/38, D06M15/568, // C08G18/79, C08G18/12, C08L75/04, C08L33/16 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
D06M15/568 (EP);
C08G18/0828 (EP);
C08G18/12 (EP);
C08G18/283 (EP);
C08G18/2875 (EP);
C08G18/792 (EP);
C08G18/8019 (EP);
C08G18/807 (EP);
C08L33/16 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/285 (EP);
C08L75/04, C08L33/16 (EP) |
Former IPC [2011/15] | C08G18/08, C08G18/28, C08G18/38, C08G18/61, C08G18/80, C09D133/16, D06M15/564, D06M15/568, C08F220/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | Wäßrige Dispersion einer hitzehärtenden Polyurethankomposition | [2011/15] | English: | Aqueous dispersion of a heat hardened polyurethane composition | [2011/15] | French: | Dispersion aqueuse d'une composition de polyuréthane durcissant à la chaleur | [2011/15] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 02.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2013 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2010 | AL | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | ES | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | HR | 25.06.2014 | IT | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | MK | 25.06.2014 | MT | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | SM | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | NO | 25.09.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | GB | 29.09.2014 | IE | 29.09.2014 | LU | 29.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | FR | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MK | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 29.09.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 29.09.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 29.09.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 29.09.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 29.09.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 29.09.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 29.09.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 29.09.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
GB | 29.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0537578 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * page 1, lines 1-17, 33-51 * * page 9, lines 21-26; example -; claims 1, 7-9 *; | [A]DE102007020790 (RUDOLF GMBH & CO KG CHEM FAB [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] - [0021] - [0 31] - [0035] - [0 44] - [0045]; example -; claim - *; | [A]JPH11279951 ; | [A]DE19852621 (HANSA TEXTILCHEMIE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, lines 23-44 * * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 14; example 11; claims 1, 9,17; compound I *; | [A]US2005171279 (COTE LINDA G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 45] - [0047] - [0074]; example - * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 54, Database accession no. 1999-629825, XP002615961 & JPH11279951 A 19991012 (NIKKA KAGAKU KK) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0622389 | US383427 | EP0537578 | DE1595017 | DE1595018 | DE2939549 | DE2134978 | DE2660200 | DE1106960 | DE1468295 | - W. SCHOLTAN; H. LANGE; KOLLOID. Z., Z. POLYMERE, (1972), vol. 250, pages 782 - 7969 | - G. KäMPF; H. SCHUSTER; ANGEW, MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, (1970), vol. 14, pages 111 - 129 |