EP2305797 - Low-lipoxygenase 1 barley [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carlsberg Research Laboratory Gamle Carlberg Vej 10 2500 Copenhagen / DK | For all designated states HEINEKEN TECHNICAL SERVICES B.V. P.O. Box 510 2380 BB Zoeterwoude / NL | For all designated states Brasseries KRONENBOURG Société dite : S.A. 68, Rte d'Oberhausbergen 67037 Strasbourg Cedex 2 / FR | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Douma, Anna Christiana Eikenlaan 11B 3707 SB Zeist / NL | 02 /
Doderer, Albert PO Box 510 2380 BB Zoeterwoude / NL | 03 /
Cameron-Mills, Varena Kirkevaenget 20 2500 Valby / DK | 04 /
Skadhauge, Brigitte Lindehoejvej 31B 3460 Birkeroed / DK | 05 /
Bech, Lene Molskov Lijehaven 83 2765 Smorum / DK | 06 /
Schmitt, Nathalie Cornelis Jostraat 46 2584 ET Den Haag / NL | 07 /
Heistek, Jolanda Carolina Van Blankenheimstraat 15 3132 VA Vlaardingen / NL | 08 /
Van Mechelen, Joannes Reinier Brouwersgracht 214 1013 HD Amsterdam / NL | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2011/14] | Williams, Aylsa, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10011413.1 | 22.01.2001 | [2011/14] | Priority number, date | US20000751687 | 29.12.2000 Original published format: US 751687 | WO2000IB02045 | 29.12.2000 Original published format: PCT/IB00/02045 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2305797 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2305797 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/02, C12N15/82, A01H5/10 | [2011/14] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/14] | Extension states | LT | 13.01.2012 | LV | 13.01.2012 | MK | 13.01.2012 | RO | 13.01.2012 | SI | 13.01.2012 | Title | German: | Gerste mit niedrigem Lipoxygenase-1 Gehalt | [2011/14] | English: | Low-lipoxygenase 1 barley | [2011/14] | French: | Orge à faible teneur en lipoxygénase 1 | [2011/14] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 13.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 23.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 10.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01902597.2 / EP1346030 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010902597) is 29.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 06.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9713851 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [XDI] - MCELROY D ET AL, "WHAT'S BREWING IN BARLEY BIOTECHNOLOGY?", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK, US, (1995), vol. 13, no. 3, ISSN 0733-222X, pages 245 - 249, XP002024712 [XD] 1-4 * page 247, column 2, paragraph L * [I] 5-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0395-245 | [XD] - DROST B W ET AL, "FLAVOR STABILITY", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BREWING CHEMISTS, (1990), vol. 48, no. 4, ISSN 0361-0470, pages 124 - 131, XP000926610 [XD] 1-4 * the whole document, especially pages 129-130 * | [X] - KOBAYASHI ET AL, "Behavior of Mono-, Di-, and Trihydroxyoctadecenoic Acids during Mashing and Methods of Controlling Their Production", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000101), vol. 90, no. 1, ISSN 1389-1723, pages 69 - 73, XP002347966 [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [I] - WU Y ET AL, "Rapid separation and genotypic variability of barley (Hordeum vulgare L.) lipoxygenase isoenzymes", JOURNAL OF CEREAL SCIENCE,, (19970101), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 49 - 56, XP002636353 [I] 1-7 * page 50, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jcrs.1996.0068 | [I] - KOWAKA, M., "Malting barley improvement for brewing", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19931206), vol. 119, no. 23, Database accession no. 248220m, page 828, column 2, XP002175449 [I] 1-7 * abstract * | [ ] - NIPPON JOZO KYOKAISHI, (1993), vol. 88, no. 8, pages 574 - 581 | [A] - VAN MECHELEN JAN R ET AL, "Molecular characterization of two lipoxygenases from barley.", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (199904), vol. 39, no. 6, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 1283 - 1298, XP001015731 [A] 1-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006118003998 | [A] - WAN HENG WANG ET AL, "Molecular basis of a null mutation in soybean lipoxygenase 2: substitution of glutamine for an iron-ligand histidine.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, WASHINGTON US, (1994), vol. 91, no. 13, pages 5828 - 5832, XP002175448 [A] 1-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.13.5828 | by applicant | US5510474 | WO9726364 | - ROBINSON ET AL., FOOD CHEM., (1995), vol. 54, pages 33 - 43 | - HILDEBRAND, J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (1990), vol. 38, pages 1934 - 1936 | - NARVEL ET AL., CROP SCI., (1998), vol. 38, pages 926 - 928 | - SUSUKI ET AL., J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (1999), vol. 47, pages 1119 - 1124 | - MEILGAARD, MBAA TECH. QUART., (1975), vol. 12, pages 151 - 168 | - DUFOUR, PROC.EUR. BREW. CONV. CONGR., (1991), pages 209 - 216 | - JOHANNESEN ET AL., PROC.EUR. BREW. CONV. CONGR., (1999), pages 655 - 662 | - BROUN; GETTNER; SOMMERVILLE, ANNU. REV. NUTR., (1999), vol. 19, pages 197 - 216 | - GARDNER, ADV. CEREAL SCI. TECHNOL., (1988), vol. 9, pages 161 - 215 | - MCELROY; JACOBSEN, BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 13, pages 245 - 249 | - DROST ET AL., J AM. SOC. BREW. CHEM., (1990), vol. 48, pages 124 - 131 | - NOëL ET AL., F AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (1999), vol. 47, pages 4323 - 4326 | - TINGAY ET AL., PLANT J, (1997), vol. 11, pages 1369 - 1376 | - WAN; LEMAUX, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1994), vol. 104, pages 37 - 48 | - FUNATSUKI; KIHARA, THEOR. APPL. GENET., (1995), vol. 91, pages 707 - 712 | - KJæRULFF ET AL., Photosynthesis: from Light to Biosphere, (1995), vol. II, pages 151 - 154 | - BEVAN ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1983), vol. 11, pages 369 - 385 | - ZHU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1999), vol. 96, pages 8768 - 8773 | - BEETHAM ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1999), vol. 96, pages 8774 - 8778 | - YOON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1999), vol. 93, pages 2071 - 2076 | - GILPIN, M.J. ET AL., Photosynthesis: Mechanisms and Effects, (1998), vol. IV, pages 2983 - 2986 | - OLSEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 8043 - 8047 | - RANK, J. ET AL., MUTAT. RES., (1997), vol. 390, pages 121 - 7 | - SKRZYPCZAK-JANKUN, PROTEINS, (1997), vol. 29, pages 15 - 31 | - MINOR, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, pages 10687 - 10701 | - PARKER; HEFFORD, PROTEIN ENG., vol. 10, (1997), pages 487 - 496, URL: http://www.expasy.ch | - GEBHARDT; SALAMINI, INT. REV. CYTOLOGY., (1992), vol. 135, pages 201 - 237 | - LBRAHAM ET AL., ANAL. CHEM, (1998), vol. 70, pages 2013 - 2017 | - KLEINHOFS ET AL., MUTATION RESEARCH, (1978), vol. 51, pages 29 - 35 | - HOLTMAN ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 111, pages 569 - 576 | - ESKIN ET AL., CRIT. REV. FOOD, SCIENCE AND NUTRITION, (1977), vol. 9, pages 1 - 40 | - BERG ET AL., ELECTROPHORESIS, (1992), vol. 13, pages 76 - 81 | - SCHMITT; VAN MECHELEN, PLANT SCI., (1997), vol. 128, pages 141 - 150 | - AARLE ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1991), vol. 280, pages 159 - 162 | - LAEMMLI, NATURE, (1970), vol. 227, pages 680 - 685 | - TOWBIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1979), vol. 76, pages 4350 - 4354 | - HOLTMAN ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1996), vol. 111, pages 569 - 576 | - HENSGENS; VAN OS-RUYGROK, RICE GENET. NEWSLETT., (1989), vol. 6, pages 163 - 168 | - PICH; SCHUBERT, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, page 3328 | - VAN MECHELEN ET AL., BBA, (1995), vol. 1254, pages 221 - 225 | - ROUSTER ET AL., PLANT J, (1997), vol. 11, pages 513 - 523 | - ROUSTER ET AL., PLANT J, (1998), vol. 15, pages 435 - 440 | - MINOR ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, pages 10687 - 10701 | - JENSEN ET AL., HEREDITAS, (1998), vol. 129, pages 215 - 225 | - SKRIVER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 7266 - 7270 | - LEE ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 13, pages 21 - 29 | - BRADFORD, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1976), vol. 72, page 248 | - GRONQVIST ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE 24TH EBC CONGRESS, (1993), pages 421 - 428 |