EP2267769 - DRAM transistor with a gate formed in a substrate trench [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83716 / US | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanh, Tang 1273 N. Jullion Avenue Boise, ID 83704 / US | 02 /
Haller, Gordon 5426 East Quartersawn Boise, ID 83716 / US | 03 /
Brown, Kris 8610 W. Atwater Garden City, ID 83714 / US | 04 /
Earl, Allen, T., III 2200 W. King Road Kuna, ID 83634 / US | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 10011474.3 | 29.08.2005 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | US20040932150 | 01.09.2004 Original published format: US 932150 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2267769 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2267769 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8242, H01L27/108, H01L21/336, H01L29/10, H01L29/417, // H01L29/78, H01L29/423 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
H01L29/41758 (EP,US);
H10B99/00 (KR);
H01L21/18 (KR);
H01L29/1037 (EP,US);
H01L29/4238 (EP,US);
H01L29/66621 (EP,US);
H10B12/00 (KR);
H10B12/053 (EP,US);
H10B12/34 (EP,US);
H01L29/4236 (EP,US);
H01L29/78 (EP,US);
H10B12/318 (EP,US);
H10B12/482 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/52] | H01L21/8242, H01L27/108, H01L21/336, H01L29/78, H01L29/423 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAM-Transistor mit einem in einem Substratgraben ausgebildeten Gatter | [2010/52] | English: | DRAM transistor with a gate formed in a substrate trench | [2010/52] | French: | Transistor pour une mémoire du type DRAM ayant une grille formée dans une tranchée dans le substrat | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05792363.3 / EP1784858 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050792363) is 05.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5244824 (SIVAN RICHARD D [US]); | [XAI]US5480838 (MITSUI KATSUYOSHI [JP]); | [A]DE19928781 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [IA]US2003170941 (COLAVITO DAVID B [US], et al) | by applicant | US2003234414 |