EP2264173 - Use of a double-stranded ribonucleic acid for targeted inhibition of the expression of a given target gene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alnylam Europe AG Fritz-Hornschuch-Strasse 9 95326 Kulmbach / DE | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Limmer, Stefan c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
Kreutzer, Roland c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 03 /
John, Matthias c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10011813.2 | 25.10.2002 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | DE2001155280 | 26.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10155280 | DE2001158411 | 29.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158411 | DE2001160151 | 07.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10160151 | WO2002EP00151 | 09.01.2002 Original published format: PCT/EP02/00151 | WO2002EP00152 | 09.01.2002 Original published format: PCT/EP02/00152 | DE2002135620 | 02.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10235620 | [2010/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2264173 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2264173 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K48/00, // A61K31/713 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
C12N15/1138 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/1131 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/53 (EP,US);
C12N2320/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2010/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung einer doppelsträngigen Ribonukleinsäure zur gezielten Hemmung der Expression eines vorgegebenen Zielgens | [2010/51] | English: | Use of a double-stranded ribonucleic acid for targeted inhibition of the expression of a given target gene | [2010/51] | French: | Utilisation d'acide ribonucléique double-brin pour l'inhibition ciblée de l'expression d'un gène cible donné | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 15.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 25.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02779511.1 / EP1438405 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020779511) is 11.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO02055692 (RIBOPHARMA AG [DE], et al) [AP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO02055693 (RIBOPHARMA AG [DE], et al) [AP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]WO03040366 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [E] 1-7,9-14 * example 5 * | [Y] - PARRISH S ET AL, "Functional anatomy of a dsRNA trigger: Differential requirement for the two trigger strands in RNA interference", MOLECULAR CELL, (20001101), vol. 6, no. 5, doi:10.1016/S1097-2765(00)00106-4, ISSN 1097-2765, pages 1077 - 1087, XP002226298 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1097-2765(00)00106-4 | [YP] - HOLEN T ET AL, "Positional effects of short interfering RNAs targeting the human coagulation trigger Tissue Factor", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20020415), vol. 30, no. 8, doi:10.1093/NAR/30.8.1757, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 1757 - 1766, XP002232890 [YP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/30.8.1757 | [AP] - JACQUE J-M ET AL, "Modulation of HIV-1 replication by RNA interference", NATURE, (20020725), vol. 418, no. 6896, doi:10.1038/NATURE00896, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 435 - 438, XP002232889 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature00896 | by applicant | DE10100586 | - ELBASHIR, S. M. ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498 | - HOLEN, T. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 30, pages 1757 - 1766 |