EP2289515 - Combinations comprising a diaryl urea and an interferon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 555 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilhelm, Scott 29 Masters Lane Milford, CT 06460 / US | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Riepe, Hans-Gerd Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Riepe, Hans-Gerd Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 D-80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10011899.1 | 31.10.2006 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | US20050731277P | 31.10.2005 Original published format: US 731277 P | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2289515 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2289515 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4412, A61K38/21, A61P35/00 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
A61K38/21 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K38/212 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/212, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/21, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kombinationen enthaltend einen Diarylharnstoff und einen Interferon | [2011/09] | English: | Combinations comprising a diaryl urea and an interferon | [2011/09] | French: | Combinaison contenant une diaryl urée et un interferon | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/20] | 19.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/20] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06827111.3 / EP1968589 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060827111) is 02.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2004113274 (BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * p.89: compound 42 * * page 22, lines 12-22 * * page 41, lines 3-12 * [Y] 1-9; | [IP]WO2006094626 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [IP] 1-9 * claim 1 * * page 3, lines 15-22 * * page 14, line 6 *; | [IP]WO2006034797 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [IP] 1-9 * claim - * * examples 1,2 * * page 10, line 24 * | [I] - "883 POSTER Phase I trial of sorafenib (BAY 43-9006) in combination with interferon alpha-2a in patients with unresectable and/or metastatic renal cell carcinoma and malignant melanoma", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER. SUPPLEMENT, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, (200510), vol. 3, no. 2, ISSN 1359-6349, page 254, XP005132997 [I] 1-9 * the whole document * | [I] - "795 ORAL Phase II trial of sorafenib (BAY 43-9006) in combination with interferon alpha 2b in patients with metastatic renal cell carcinoma", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER. SUPPLEMENT, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, (200510), vol. 3, no. 2, ISSN 1359-6349, pages 226 - 227, XP005132909 [I] 1-9 * the whole document * | [Y] - AHMAD T ET AL, "Kinase inhibition with BAY 43-9006 in renal cell carcinoma", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20040319), vol. 10, no. 18 Pt 2, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 6388S - 6392S, XP002362669 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 6390S, column L, lines 14-23 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-040028 | by applicant | WO9404157 | US5023252 | US5011472 | WO0042012 | WO0041698 | WO9800402 | EP0542609 | DE2436108 | US2002042517 | WO02085859 | WO02085857 | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - WILLIAMS & WILKINS ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORM AND DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS, (1995), pages 27 - 29 | - Goodman and Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, MCGRAW-HILL, (1996), pages 11 - 13 | - GOODMAN ET AL., Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, MCGRAW-HILL, (1996), pages 1225 - 1287 | - Organic Reactions, JOHN WILEY | - Organic Syntheses, JOHN WILEY | - Reagents for Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY | - The Total Synthesis of Natural Products, JOHN WILEY | - The Organic Chemistry of Drug Synthesis, JOHN WILEY | - Annual Reports in Organic Synthesis, ACADEMIC PRESS | - Methoden der Organischen Chemie, HOUBEN-WEYL | - POWELL, M.F. ET AL., "Compendium of Excipients for Parenteral Formulations", PDA JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 52, no. 5, pages 238 - 311, XP009119027 | - STRICKLEY, R.G, "Parenteral Formulations of Small Molecule Therapeutics Marketed in the United States (1999)-Part-l", PDA JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 53, no. 6, pages 324 - 349 | - NEMA, S. ET AL., "Excipients and Their Use in Injectable Products", PDA JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 51, no. 4, pages 166 - 171 | - POWELL, M.F., "Compendium of Excipients for Parenteral Formulations", PDA JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 52, no. 5, pages 238 - 311, XP009119027 | - STRICKLEY, R.G, "Parenteral Formulations of Small Molecule Therapeutics Marketed in the United States (1999)-Part-1", PDA JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 53, no. 6, pages 324 - 349 | - NEMA, S., "Excipients and Their Use in Injectable Products", PDA JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 51, no. 4, pages 166 - 171 | - RIEDL, B. ET AL., "O-Carboxy Aryl Substituted Diphenyl Ureas as raf Kinase Inhibitors", PCT INT. APPL. | - RIEDL, B. ET AL., "O-Carboxy Aryl Substituted Diphenyl Ureas as p38 Kinase Inhibitors", PCT INT. APPL. | - BANKSTON ET AL., "A Scaleable Synthesis of BAY 43-9006: A Potent Raf Kinase Inhibitor for the Treatment of Cancer", ORG. PROC. RES. DEV., (2002), vol. 6, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1021/OP020205N, pages 777 - 781, XP002524977 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/OP020205N | - IBID BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (1995), vol. 3, page 129 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 12761B | - IBID KOGYO KAGAKU ZASSHI, (1967), vol. 70, page 491 | WO2004US15655 | US20010948915 | US20040556062 | US19990605203 | US20030471735 |