EP2287775 - Locally adaptable security management framework for networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McAfee, Inc. 3965 Freedom Circle Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2013/30] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states SECURE COMPUTING CORPORATION 2675 Long Lake Road Roseville Minnesota 55113 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomson, Daniel Jay 3565 Cleveland Street NE Minneapolis Minnesota 55418 / US | 02 /
O`Brian, Richard 9709 Oliver Avenue Nort Brooklyn Park Minnesota 55444 / US | 03 /
Bogle, Jessica 1703 Elm Street White Bear Lake Minnesota 55110 / US | 04 /
Payne, Charles 7135 47th Street Court North Oakdale Minnesota 55128 / US | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2011/08] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 10012112.8 | 01.12.2000 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | US19990168656P | 02.12.1999 Original published format: US 168656 P | US20000483164P | 14.01.2000 Original published format: US 483164 P | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2287775 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/24, G06Q10/00 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
H04L63/06 (EP,US);
G06F21/604 (EP,US);
G06F21/6236 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99939 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | Lokal anpassbarer Sicherheitsverwaltungsrahmen für Netzwerke | [2011/08] | English: | Locally adaptable security management framework for networks | [2011/08] | French: | Cadre de gestion de sécurité adaptable localement pour réseaux | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 02.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/35] | 23.07.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.09.2013 | 25.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00982361.8 / EP1234222 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000982361) is 10.10.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0854431 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 10, line 12 - column 12, line 27 *; | [A]US5826239 (DU WEIMIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 17 - column 10, line 55 *; | [A]US5930512 (BODEN EDWARD BARNES [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A] - THOMSEN D ET AL, "Napoleon - Network Application Policy Environment", PROCEEDINGS 4TH. ACM WORKSHOP ON ROLE-BASED ACCESS CONTROL. FAIRFAX, VA, OCT. 28 - 29, 1999; [ACM ROLE-BASED ACCESS CONTROL WORKSHOP], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (19991028), doi:10.1145/319171.319185, ISBN 978-1-58113-180-2, pages 145 - 152, XP002163998 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/319171.319185 |