EP2290949 - Method, medium and system for optimizing capture device settings through depth information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/09] | Method and apparatus for optimizing capture device settings through depth information | ||
[2019/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8270 / JP | [2017/30] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Incorporated 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marks, Richard 919 East Hillsdale Boulevard, 2nd Floor Foster City CA 94404-2175 / US | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/09] | Davies, Simon Robert D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10012182.1 | 17.12.2004 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | US20040758817 | 16.01.2004 Original published format: US 758817 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2290949 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2290949 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2290949 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N5/235 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
H04N5/2226 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/635 (EP,US);
H04N23/72 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/272 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/1012 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/1093 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/69 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/09] | H04N5/232 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/49] |
Former [2011/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, Medium und System zur Optimierung der Einstellungen einer Erfassungsvorrichtung mittels Tiefeninformation | [2019/19] | English: | Method, medium and system for optimizing capture device settings through depth information | [2019/19] | French: | Procédé, medium et système pour optimiser les paramètres de dispositif de capture par des informations de profondeur | [2019/19] |
Former [2011/09] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Optimierung der Einstellungen einer Erfassungsvorrichtung mittels Tiefeninformation | ||
Former [2011/09] | Method and apparatus for optimizing capture device settings through depth information | ||
Former [2011/09] | Procédé et appareil pour optimiser les paramètres de dispositif de capture par des informations de profondeur | Examination procedure | 24.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 20.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04814607.0 / EP1704711 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040814607) is 04.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2004 | AT | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | ES | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | IT | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | NL | 04.12.2019 | PL | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | IE | 17.12.2019 | LU | 17.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | [2022/26] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.12.2004 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 17.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 04.12.2019 | |
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 17.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 17.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 17.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 04.12.2019 | |
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 17.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 04.12.2019 | |
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 17.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | CZ | 04.12.2019 | |
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 04.12.2019 | |
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 04.12.2019 | |
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 04.12.2019 | |
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 04.12.2019 | |
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | ES | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0750202 (YALESTOWN CORP NV [AN]) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 56 *; | [A]US6057909 (YAHAV GIORA [IL], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 55 * * column 13, line 61 - line 65 * * page 15, line 24 - line 42 * * column 16, line 20 - column 18, line 44 * * figures 8A,8B *; | [A]WO0118563 (3DV SYSTEMS LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1,12 * page 9, line 15 - page 12, line 8 ** figure 1 *; | [A]US2003100363 (ALI GUISEPPE C [US]) [A] 1,12 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] * * figures 5,6 *; | [A]FR2832892 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]) [A] 1-16 * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 16 * * page 10, line 24 - line 29 * * figures 7a,8 * |