EP2266503 - DEVICE TO IMPLANT A CARDIAC VALVE PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/52] | Device and method to implant an endoprosthesis | ||
[2016/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JenaValve Technology, Inc. 7545 Irvine Center Drive, Suite 100 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular Galway Limited Parkmore Business Park West Ballybrit Galway / IE | [2017/41] |
Former [2016/30] | For all designated states JenaValve Technology, Inc. 7545 Irvine Center Drive, Suite 100 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | ||
For all designated states Bonhoeffer, Philipp 14 Cantelowes Road London NW1 9XP / GB | |||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states JenaValve Technology GmbH Guerickestrasse 25 80805 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Bonhoeffer, Philipp 14 Cantelowes Road London NW1 9XP / GB | |||
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states JenaValve Technology Inc. Regus Business Centre Wilmington Downtown 1000 N. West Street, Suite 1200 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | ||
For all designated states Bonhoeffer, Philipp 14 Cantelowes Road London NW1 9XP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonhoeffer, Philipp 14 Cantelowes Road London NW19XP / GB | 02 /
Younes, Boudjemline 25 Allée de la toison d'or 94000 Creteil / FR | [2017/01] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
Bonhoeffer, Philipp 14 Cantelowes Road London NW1 9XP / GB | ||
02 /
Younes, Boudjemline 25 Allée de la toison d'or 94000 Creteil / FR | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Zwicker, Jörk, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Zwicker, Jörk, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10012198.7 | 02.08.2002 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | FR20010010444 | 03.08.2001 Original published format: FR 0110444 | [2010/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2266503 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2266503 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2266503 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24, A61F2/06 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP,US);
A61F2/2409 (US);
A61F2/2427 (US);
A61F2/2436 (EP,US);
A61F2002/061 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP,US);
A61F2250/001 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/52] | A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2010/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG FÜR EINE HERZKLAPPENPROTHESE | [2016/34] | English: | DEVICE TO IMPLANT A CARDIAC VALVE PROSTHESIS | [2016/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMPLANTATION D'UNE PROTHÈSE DE VALVE CARDIAQUE | [2016/34] |
Former [2010/52] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Endoprothesen | ||
Former [2010/52] | Device and method to implant an endoprosthesis | ||
Former [2010/52] | Dispositif et méthode d'implantation d'une endoprothèse | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 19.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02291953.4 / EP1281375 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020291953) is 29.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 14.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | LU | 02.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 02.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 02.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 02.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5053008 (BAJAJ SANDEEP [US]) [A] 1-10* column 7, line 13 - column 8, line 2 *; | [X]WO9942058 (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9,10 * page 7, line 10 - line 18 * * page 8, line 19 - line 23 *; | [X]WO0069367 (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * figure 1 * * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 10 * * page 7, line 5 - line 8 * | Examination | WO0149213 | by applicant | US5824063 | US5855601 | US5868783 |