EP2357279 - Compositions containing expandable microspheres and an ionic compound as well as methods of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY 6285 Tri-Ridge Boulevard Loveland OH 45140 / US | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mohan, Krishna K. 7661 Brookfarm Court Mason Ohio 45040 / US | 02 /
Goliber, Cynthia A. 2005 Northridge Way Phoenixville Pennsylvania 19460 / US | 03 /
Hong, Yaoliang 6754 Man O War Lane Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 04 /
Froass, Peter M. 6863 Parklake Drive Mason, Ohio 45231 / US | 05 /
Young, Herbert 9957 Beech Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45231 / US | 06 /
Anderson, D. W. 6485 Marathon Edenton Road Goshen, Ohio 45122 / US | 07 /
Faber, Richard D. 7784 October Rose Cove Memphis, Tennessee 38119 / US | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Michael, et al Heisse Kursawe Eversheds Brienner Strasse 12 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Schneider, Michael, et al Heisse Kursawe Eversheds Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Maximiliansplatz 5 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10012208.4 | 13.03.2006 | [2011/33] | Priority number, date | US20050660703P | 11.03.2005 Original published format: US 660703 P | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2357279 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/54, // D21H23/08, D21H17/56, D21H17/41, D21H17/68 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
D21H21/54 (EP,KR,US);
D21H17/41 (EP,KR,US);
D21H17/69 (EP,US);
D21H21/22 (EP,US);
D21H23/04 (EP,US);
D21H23/08 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen mit erweiterbaren Mikrosphären und einer ionischen Verbindung sowie Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2011/33] | English: | Compositions containing expandable microspheres and an ionic compound as well as methods of making the same | [2011/33] | French: | Compositions contenant des microsphères extensibles et composé ionique, ainsi que procédés de fabrication associés | [2011/33] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 10.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06738115.2 / EP1856326 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060738115) is 25.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2012 | 31.03.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004209023 (SWOBODA DEAN P [US], et al) [X] 1,6,8,9,13,17,18 * claims 1-148 *; | [X]US6379497 (SANDSTROM ERLAND [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9,14,17 * paragraph [0182]; claims 1-69 *; | [X]US2002104632 (JIMENEZ GRACIELA [US], et al) [X] 1,5,14,18 * paragraphs [0048] , [0049]; claims 1-17 *; | [A]DE4312854 (FELDMUEHLE AG STORA [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2015611 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004030080 (CHANG YIHUA [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US3824114 (VASSILIADES A, et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6846529 | US6802938 | US5856389 | US5342649 | US2004065424 | US2004052989 | US2001038893 | US3615972 | US3864181 | US4006273 | US4044176 | US6617364 | US2001044477 | US2003008931 | US2003008932 | US2004157057 | US4722943 | US4829094 | US6592717 | US6592712 | US6582557 | US6579415 | US6579414 | US6506282 | US6471824 | US6361651 | US6146494 | USH1704H | US5731080 | US5698688 | US5698074 | US5667637 | US5662773 | US5531728 | US5443899 | US5360420 | US5266250 | US5209953 | US5160789 | US5049235 | US4986882 | US4496427 | US4431481 | US4174417 | US4166894 | US4075136 | US4022965 | US6893473 | US2004065423 | US2004123966 | US6379497 | US20050654712 | US20060358543 | WO2006US06011 | US20060759629 | US20060759630 | US20030662699 | US20040945306 |