EP2275960 - Secure device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Natsume, Matsuzaki Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Sakushima, Kazuo Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Makoto, Tatebayashi Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10012227.4 | 07.03.2003 | [2011/03] | Priority number, date | JP20020068097 | 13.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002068097 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2275960 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
G06F21/60 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/78 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72406 (EP,US);
H04M1/72409 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2113 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | Sichere Vorrichtung | [2011/03] | English: | Secure device | [2011/03] | French: | Dispositif sécurisé | [2011/03] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 17.04.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03708510.7 / EP1523705 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030708510) is 12.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |