EP2316512 - Spring clip as needle tip protection for a safety IV catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun Melsungen AG Carl-Braun-Strasse 1 34212 Melsungen / DE | [2013/29] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states B. Braun Melsungen AG Carl-Braun-Strasse 1 34212 Melsungen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wynkoop, Mark 3319 Lanark Road Coopersberg PA 18036 / US | 02 /
Kohler, Matthew 4097 E. Mill Road E. Greenville PA 18041 / US | 03 /
Woehr, Kevin Danzinger Strasse 2 34587 Felsberg / DE | 04 /
Orth, Manfred Heckenweg 18 34246 Vellmar / DE | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Kinkeldey, Daniela Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Kinkeldey, Daniela Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistrasse 14 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/18] | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10012849.5 | 18.08.1998 | [2011/18] | Priority number, date | US19970915148 | 20.08.1997 Original published format: US 915148 | US19980097170 | 12.06.1998 Original published format: US 97170 | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2316512 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2316512 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2316512 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32, A61M25/06 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
A61M25/0618 (EP,US);
A61M25/0625 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3247 (EP,US);
A61M2005/325 (EP,US);
A61M5/3273 (EP,US);
A61M5/3275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2011/18] | Title | German: | Federklemme als Schutz der Nadelspitze für einen Sicherheits-IV-Katheter | [2011/18] | English: | Spring clip as needle tip protection for a safety IV catheter | [2011/18] | French: | Pince à ressort en tant que protection d'extrémité d'aiguille pour cathéter IV de sécurité | [2011/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 13.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04000853.4 / EP1421969 | EP98948843.2 / EP1003588 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980948843) is 03.04.2003 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.07.2013 | BE | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | NL | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | IE | 18.08.2013 | LU | 18.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/33] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 18.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 18.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]US5135504 (MCLEES DONALD J [US]) [XD] 1-3,5,10,12,14,15,18,19 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 11,16; | [Y]US5344408 (PARTIKA LAWRENCE [US]) [Y] 16 * figure 10 *; | [YD]US5558651 (CRAWFORD MARK A [US], et al) [YD] 11 * figures 1-4 *; | [XP]WO9742989 (POPOV SERGEY [IL]) [XP] 1-3,12,13,15* figures 6,7 * | by applicant | US4929241 | US4978344 | US5053017 | US5135504 | USRE34416E | US5558651 | US5697907 |