EP2281922 - Method and apparatus of using solution based precursors for atomic layer deposition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde LLC 575 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hogle, Richard, Allen 4654 Merrick Court Oceanside CA 92056 / US | 02 /
Helly, Patrick, Joseph 14110 Oak Glen Road Valley Center CA 92082 / US | 03 /
Wang, Qing, Min 135 Meadowview Road North Andover, MA 01845 / US | 04 /
Ma, Ce 5653 Shasta Daisy Trail San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2011/18] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
Hogle, Richard, Allen 4654 Merrick Court Oceanside CA 92056 / US | ||
02 /
Helly, Patrick, Joseph 14110 Oak Glen Road Valley Center CA 92082 / US | |||
03 /
Wang, Qing, Min 135 Meadowview Road North Andover, MA 01845 / US | |||
04 /
Ma, Ce 305 Billinggratz Turn Lane Cary NC 27519 / US | |||
Former [2011/06] | 01 /
Hogle, Richard, Allen 4654 Merrick Court Oceanside CA 92056 / US | ||
02 /
Helly, Patrick, Joseph 14110 Oak Glen Road Valley Center CA 92082 / US | |||
03 /
Wang, Qing, Min 235 West Locust Avenue Edison New Jersey 08820 / US | |||
04 /
Ma, Ce 305 Billinggratz Turn Lane Cary NC 27519 / US | Representative(s) | Gellner, Bernd Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/06] | Gellner, Bernd Linde AG Legal Services Intellectual Property Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 10012892.5 | 25.04.2006 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | US20050676491P | 29.04.2005 Original published format: US 676491 P | US20060400904 | 10.04.2006 Original published format: US 400904 | [2011/06] | Previously filed application, date | EP20060252213 | 25.04.2006 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2281922 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2281922 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
C23C16/45544 (EP,US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
C23C16/448 (EP,US);
C23C16/45525 (EP,US);
Y10T428/8305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur lösungs-basierten Abscheidung von Atomschichten | [2011/06] | English: | Method and apparatus of using solution based precursors for atomic layer deposition | [2011/06] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour dépôt par couche atomique utilisant une solution. | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 03.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/51] | 16.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06252213.1 / EP1717343 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060252213) is 12.06.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5356477 (VISSER JAN [NL]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 8 - line 55 * * column 6, line 21 - line 58 * [Y] 2,3,5-15; | [Y]US2004043149 (GORDON ROY G [US], et al) [Y] 5 * table 1 *; | [Y] - POTTER R J ET AL, "DEPOSITION OF HFO2, GD2O3 AND PROX BY LIQUID INJECTION ALD TECHNIQUES", CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION, WILEY-VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (200503), vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 0948-1907, pages 159 - 169, XP001236223 [Y] 2,3,6,7,9-15 * paragraph [02.1] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cvde.200406348 | [Y] - D.B. BEACH ET AL, "MOCVD of very thin films of lead lanthanum titanate", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS. METAL-ORGANIC CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION OF ELECTRONIC CERAMICS II., us, (19951127), vol. 415, pages 225 - 230, XP008079571 [Y] 8 *Deposition process* |