EP2338641 - Stepping gear for a tensioning and/or spreading tool and tensioning and/or spreading tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CY, HU, NL, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Irwin Industrial Tool Company 8935 North Pointe Executive Drive Huntersville, NC 28078 / US | [2013/40] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Irwin Industrial Tools GmbH Lilienthalstrasse 5 85399 Hallbergmoos / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geier, Manfred Münchner Strasse 2 82178 Puchheim / DE | 02 /
Strauß, Ralf Im Grund 29 51588 Nümbrecht / DE | 03 /
Reed, Phil 196 Spring Vale Road Sheffield South Yorkshire S63NU / GB | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Nils T.F. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Schmid, Nils T.F. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/26] | Schmid, Nils T.F. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10012911.3 | 02.08.2004 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | DE2003135353 | 01.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10335353 | DE2003135354 | 01.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10335354 | DE2003135365 | 01.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10335365 | DE2003135352 | 01.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10335352 | DE2003135351 | 01.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10335351 | [2011/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2338641 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2338641 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B25B5/06 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
B25B5/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2011/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schrittgetriebe für ein Spann- und/oder Spreizwerkzeug und Spann- und/oder Spreizwerkzeug | [2011/26] | English: | Stepping gear for a tensioning and/or spreading tool and tensioning and/or spreading tool | [2011/26] | French: | Mécanisme pas à pas pour un outil de serrage et/ou d'écartement et outil de serrage et/ou d'écartement | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 12.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04763710.3 / EP1648660 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040763710) is 09.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2004 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | ES | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | IT | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | SE | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | AT | 02.08.2015 | IE | 02.08.2015 | LU | 02.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | FR | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
AT | 02.08.2015 | ||
IE | 02.08.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 02.08.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 02.08.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 02.08.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
GR | 18.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2204264 (RHOMBUS TOOLS LIMITED) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]WO03013793 (AMERICAN TOOL COMP INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 15, line 19 - page 21, line 2; figures 13-19 * | Examination | US5722829 | by applicant | DE3917473 | EP0997233 |