EP2335774 - Multi-electrode cochlear implant system with distributed electronics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cochlear Limited 14 Mars Road Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ibrahim, Ibrahim Hanna 18 Folkard Street Nort Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | 02 /
Parker, John L. c/o Cochlear Limited, IP Department 1 university Avenue Macquarie University NSW 2109 / AU | [2012/49] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
Ibrahim, Ibrahim Hanna 18 Folkard Street Nort Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | ||
02 /
Parker, John L. c/o Cochlear Limited, IP Department, 1 university Avenue Macquarie University NSW 2109 / AU | |||
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
Ibrahim, Ibrahim Hanna 18 Folkard Street Nort Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | ||
02 /
Parker, John L. 19 Moore Street Roseville, NSW 2069 / AU | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10012931.1 | 28.06.2002 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | AU2001PR06048 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: AU PR604801 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2335774 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2335774 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
A61N1/0541 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | Kochlearimplantatsystem mit mehreren Elektroden und verteilter Elektronik | [2011/25] | English: | Multi-electrode cochlear implant system with distributed electronics | [2011/25] | French: | Système d'implant cochléaire multi-électrodes avec appareils électroniques distribués | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 15.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02734913.3 / EP1425938 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020734913) is 15.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2012 | BE | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | IT | 05.12.2012 | MC | 05.12.2012 | NL | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.03.2013 | ES | 16.03.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | GB | 28.06.2013 | IE | 28.06.2013 | LU | 28.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | FR | 01.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
GB | 28.06.2013 | ||
IE | 28.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
GB | 28.06.2013 | ||
IE | 28.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
GB | 28.06.2013 | ||
IE | 28.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
IE | 28.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 05.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4532930 (CROSBY PETER A [AU], et al) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US5038781 (LYNCH H WILFRED [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 11 - column 5, line 13 *; | [A]US5749912 (ZHANG CHAOYING [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 33 * | by applicant | US4532930 | WO2002AU00575 |