EP2311689 - Method for manufacturing a decorative member, particularly intended to be used as an emblem on a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZANINI HOLDING S.p.A. Via Oleggio Castello 10 28040 Paruzzaro (Novara) / IT | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zanini, Paolo Via A. Cantoni 14 28041 Arona (Novara) / IT | 02 /
Franzino, Mario Viale Monza 62 20127 Milano / IT | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Cian, Paolo Saconney & Cian S.r.l Corso Vittorio Emanuelle II 14 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Cian, Paolo Saconney & Cian S.r.l Corso Vittorio Emanuelle II 14 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 10013338.8 | 06.10.2010 | [2011/16] | Priority number, date | IT2009TO00786 | 16.10.2009 Original published format: IT TO20090786 | [2011/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311689 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/00, // B44C3/02, B44C1/17, B44C1/14, B29C45/00, B60R13/04 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
B60R13/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Dekorationselements, insbesondere zur Benutzung als Emblem für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2011/16] | English: | Method for manufacturing a decorative member, particularly intended to be used as an emblem on a motor vehicle | [2011/16] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un élément décoratif, en particulier destiné à être utilisé comme emblème sur un véhicule à moteur | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 16.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/15] | 19.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2012 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1927480 (ZANINI S P A [IT]) [AD] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0022] *; | [A]JPH01275235 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPS63110048 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0238160 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1707988 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004058541 (GREEN TOKAI CO LTD [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0032] *; | [A]EP0266109 (REXHAM CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19927175 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB1253355 (CREATORS LTD) [A] 1 * figure - * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 87 * | by applicant | EP1927480 |