EP2383470 - Plunger pump actuated by a shape memory element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Diabetes Care Inc. 1360 South Loop Road Alameda, CA 94502 / US | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rush, Benjamin 5915 LaSalle Avenue Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 02 /
Reggiardo, Christopher, V. 3702 Spyglass Court Castro Valley, CA 94546 / US | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10013446.9 | 09.10.2003 | [2011/44] | Priority number, date | US20020417464P | 09.10.2002 Original published format: US 417464 P | US20020424613P | 06.11.2002 Original published format: US 424613 P | US20020424414P | 06.11.2002 Original published format: US 424414 P | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383470 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F04B23/08, F03G7/06, F04B43/08, F04B13/00, A61M5/142, F04B43/09, G01F11/02, F04B49/06, F04B17/03, F04B19/22, F04B43/04, F04B51/00, G05D7/06 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
F04B43/043 (EP,US);
A61M5/14216 (EP,US);
A61M5/14244 (EP,US);
F03G7/065 (EP,US);
F04B13/00 (EP,US);
F04B17/03 (EP,US);
F04B19/22 (EP,US);
F04B43/08 (EP,US);
F04B49/065 (EP,US);
F04B51/00 (EP,US);
G01F11/021 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0266 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0288 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,US);
A61M2205/702 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/44] | Title | German: | Plungerpumpe mit einem Antrieb aus einer Formgedächtnislegierung | [2011/44] | English: | Plunger pump actuated by a shape memory element | [2011/44] | French: | Pompe à plongeur avec entraînement par un alliage à mémoire de forme | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/29] | 03.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03770727.0 / EP1552146 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2718492 (PATAILLOT GEORGES [FR]) [A] 1-22 * page 1, line 1 - line 20 * * page 7, line 14 - page 10, line 27 ** sentence 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0709573 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-22 * column 3, line 49 - column 6, line 6 * * figure 2 *; | [I]US5919167 (MULHAUSER PAUL J [US], et al) [I] 1-9,12-17,20-22 * column 1, line 33 - line 46 * * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 53 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US6224572 (JACOBSEN STEPHEN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,12-17,20-22 * column 3, line 39 - column 7, line 16 * * figure 1 *; | [YD]US6375638 (NASON CLYDE [US], et al) [YD] 1-9,12-17,20-22 * figures 1,3 * * column 3, line 38 - column 6, line 35 * | by applicant | US6375638 | US6560471 |