EP2311406 - Ear plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meyer, Thomas Bergseestraße 12 91217 Hersbruck / DE | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Äußere Sulzbacher Strasse 159/161 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2011/28] | Mörtel & Höfner Äußere Sulzbacher Strasse 159/161 90491 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10013576.3 | 11.10.2010 | [2011/16] | Priority number, date | DE20092014015U | 16.10.2009 Original published format: DE 202009014015 U | [2011/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311406 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/08 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
A61F11/08 (EP);
A61F11/085 (EP);
A61F11/12 (EP);
A61F2250/0019 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gehörschutzstöpsel | [2011/16] | English: | Ear plug | [2011/16] | French: | Bouchon d'oreille | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/38] | 13.08.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.11.2019 | 25.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO03072623 (HENKEL LOCTITE CORP [US], et al) [X] 3 * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] , [0018] , [0020] * [Y] 1,7; | [XY]EP1629805 (PHONAK AG [CH]) [X] 5 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0037] , [0038]; figures 2,3,5 * [Y] 1,7; | [X] - Dreve Otoplastik GmbH, "Fotoplast Technik", (20051010), pages 1 - 13, URL: http://www.dreve.de/dreve_neu/pdf/otoplastik/Fotoplast_DE.pdf, (20110211), XP002622212 [X] 2 * page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 4 * | [X] - 3M Deutschland GmbH, Safety Division - Arbetschutz, "3M sonus Otoplastiken Classic", (20090601), page 39, 3M Arbeitsschutz Produktkataloge, URL: http://www.3m.com/intl/eu/ohes/soft_headtops/de/safety_produktkatalog_2009.pdf, (20110211), XP002622213 [X] 4,6 * the whole document * | Examination | - Reiner Weiß, "Studie zur Schutzwirkung von Gehörschutz-Otoplastiken", Präventionsbericht 2/2006, (20060731), pages 1 - 34, URL: http://www.bghm.de/fileadmin/user_upload/Arbeitsschuetzer/Fachinformationen/Laerm_Vibration/Schutzwirkung_Gehoerschutzotoplastiken.pdf, (20150220), XP055171168 |