EP2381319 - Fusing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | ||
Former [2016/37] | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi, 467-8561 / JP | ||
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Yasushi c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Kei c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Noboru c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | 04 /
Miyauchi, Yoshihiro c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | 05 /
Kondo, Tomohiro c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi, 467-8562 / JP | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2011/43] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 10013603.5 | 13.10.2010 | [2011/43] | Priority number, date | JP20090250228 | 30.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009250228 | [2011/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2381319 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2381319 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2381319 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2381319 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20, G03G15/16 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
G03G15/2053 (EP,US);
G03G15/165 (US);
G03G15/2007 (US);
G03G15/2025 (US);
G03G15/2035 (US);
G03G15/206 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/43] | G03G15/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2011/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Fixiervorrichtung | [2011/43] | English: | Fusing device | [2011/43] | French: | Dispositif de fusion | [2011/43] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 11.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.09.2016 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2010 | AL | 14.09.2016 | AT | 14.09.2016 | BE | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | IT | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | NL | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | RS | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | IE | 13.10.2016 | LU | 13.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | NO | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 13.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
TR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.10.2016 | ||
LU | 13.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 13.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
TR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.10.2016 | ||
LU | 13.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 13.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.10.2016 | ||
LU | 13.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.10.2016 | ||
LU | 13.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 13.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 14.09.2016 | |
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009092423 (SHIN SU-HO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0066] , [0068] , [0069] , [0071] , [0073] , [0079]; figures 3,6 *; | [Y]US2004151522 (KATO AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0057] , [0058] , [0063] - [0065] - [0070] - [072.]; figures 3,6 *; | [AD]JP2006047769 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [AD] 1-6 * paragraphs [0061] , [0064] - [0066] * * abstract *; | [A]US2009041515 (KIM JEONG-HWA [KR]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0045] , [0049] , [0052] , [0053] , [0056] , [0060] , [0062] , [0064]; figure - *; | [A]JPH08248791 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | Examination | JP2007033552 | by applicant | JP2006047769 |