EP2447598 - Led road light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lin, Chiu-Min No. 35, Aly 64, Ln. 356 Datong Rd. Guishan Township Taoyuan County / TW | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10013966.6 | 26.10.2010 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447598 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/00, F21S8/08, F21V17/10, F21V29/00 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
F21V17/104 (EP,US);
F21S8/086 (EP);
F21V29/74 (EP);
F21W2131/103 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-Strassenlampe | [2012/18] | English: | Led road light | [2012/18] | French: | Lumière de route à DEL | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008125772 (LYRACOM [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 6, line 3 - page 18, line 26; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2009073681 (CHEN KUEI-FANG [TW]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2009168416 (ZHANG WEN-XIANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-6 * |